Norris et al v. United States Army
Plaintiff: Brittney Norris and Zachary Norris
Defendant: United States Army
Case Number: 5:2019cv04057
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated.(ctv)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs move to dismiss the case. Counsel for defendant has stated in an email that defendant does not oppose the motion. After reviewing the record, the applicable law, and the email, the Court grants the motion. This case is dismissed without prejudice. All pending motions are denied without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/16/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
August 15, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Brittney Norris, Zachary Norris (Rombold, Peter)
August 14, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Please disregard docket entry #12 MOTION for Extension of Time as it was filed in error. Corrected motion has been attached to docket entry #10 MOTION for Extension of Time and docket entry 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time grants docket entry #10 Motion for Extension of Time. See docket entry #10 and 11 . (msb)
August 13, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss as to 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(rel)
August 13, 2019 Filing 12 (PLEASE DISREGARD THIS ENTRY AS IT WAS FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss as to 11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, by Plaintiffs Brittney Norris, Zachary Norris (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Rombold, Peter) Modified text on 8/14/2019 (msb).
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Response deadline 8/26/2019. Entered by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/13/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb) Corrected District Judge on 8/13/2019 (msb).
August 12, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION for extension of time . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(rel)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for extension of time to file response by Plaintiffs Brittney Norris, Zachary Norris. (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2019: #1 Correct Motion to Continue) (msb).
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. The undersigned Magistrate Judge communicated to counsel, via letter dated July 24, 2019 regarding deferred scheduling of this case. Having received no objection from Plaintiff and no response from Defendant, the initial order and scheduling in this case shall be deferred pending ruling on the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 5). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/6/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(rel)
August 5, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORDS from Geary County District Court. (Allman, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Wendy A. Lynn on behalf of United States Army (Lynn, Wendy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Army(Allman, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Army (Allman, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, and Designation of Place of Trial as Amended by United States Army re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Designation of Place of Trial. (Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Redacted Main Document) (jal).
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant United States Army - trial to be held in Topeka. (Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Redacted Main Document) (jal).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant United States Army. (Allman, Christopher)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Geary County District Court, case number 2019-MV-000028 Trial location of Topeka, filed by United States Army.(Allman, Christopher) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #1 Redacted Main Document) (jal).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norris et al v. United States Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Norris
Represented By: Peter C. Rombold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Norris
Represented By: Peter C. Rombold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Army
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Represented By: Wendy A. Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?