Coover et al v. Neosho Ridge Wind LLC
Plaintiff: Martha Hizey, Diann Fisher, Michaela Whitworth, Kimberly Whittley, Robert Brotherton, Max Grossnickle, Chad L. Warner, Ronald Winkler, Dona D Jeffrey, Douglas Q. Reed, Brian McCracken, G. Darren Wallace, Troy A. Russell, Dillon Rapp, Terri Winkler, Martin D. Volz, Chetopa 14, LLC, Shawn Sexton, Debra Coover, Brenda Rice, Cody Garten, Gina Burnett, Kristian D. Van Meteren, Belinda Garten, James J. Simon, Peggy Brotherton, Charles W. Morse, Cheryl Burk, Jeb Kaufman, Nathan Whitworth, Dustie Elsworth, John Blair, Margaret Denise Houghton, Dustan E. Dyke, Stephen D. Jeffrey, Brian M. Bideau, David Burnett, LeRoy Burk, Robert L. Rice, II, Bryan Coover, Ed Lacen, Judy Fulps, Rex A. Houghton, Christine Brungardt and Ray Hizey
Defendant: Neosho Ridge Wind LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04064
Filed: July 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PROTECTIVE ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/24/19. (adc)
September 24, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Flaherty, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC . (Flaherty, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Flaherty, James)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Plaintiffs Brian M. Bideau, John Blair, Peggy Brotherton, Robert Brotherton, Christine Brungardt, Cheryl Burk, LeRoy Burk, David Burnett, Gina Burnett, Chetopa 14, LLC, Bryan Coover, Debra Coover, Dustan E. Dyke, Dustie Elsworth, Diann Fisher, Judy Fulps, Belinda Garten, Cody Garten, Max Grossnickle, Martha Hizey, Ray Hizey, Margaret Denise Houghton, Rex A. Houghton, Dona D Jeffrey, Stephen D. Jeffrey, Jeb Kaufman, Ed Lacen, Brian McCracken, Charles W. Morse, Dillon Rapp, Douglas Q. Reed, Brenda Rice, Robert L. Rice, II, Troy A. Russell, Shawn Sexton, James J. Simon, Kristian D. Van Meteren, Martin D. Volz, G. Darren Wallace, Chad L. Warner, Kimberly Whittley, Michaela Whitworth, Nathan Whitworth, Ronald Winkler, Terri Winkler Regarding Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. (Hughes, Patrick)
September 13, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Brian M. Bideau, John Blair, Peggy Brotherton, Robert Brotherton, Christine Brungardt, Cheryl Burk, LeRoy Burk, David Burnett, Gina Burnett, Chetopa 14, LLC, Bryan Coover, Debra Coover, Dustan E. Dyke, Dustie Elsworth, Diann Fisher, Judy Fulps, Belinda Garten, Cody Garten, Max Grossnickle, Martha Hizey, Ray Hizey, Margaret Denise Houghton, Rex A. Houghton, Dona D Jeffrey, Stephen D. Jeffrey, Jeb Kaufman, Ed Lacen, Brian McCracken, Charles W. Morse, Dillon Rapp, Douglas Q. Reed, Brenda Rice, Robert L. Rice, II, Troy A. Russell, Shawn Sexton, James J. Simon, Kristian D. Van Meteren, Martin D. Volz, G. Darren Wallace, Chad L. Warner, Kimberly Whittley, Michaela Whitworth, Nathan Whitworth, Ronald Winkler, Terri Winkler re #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Hughes, Patrick)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Neosho Ridge Wind LLC of Interrogatories, Requests for Production and Requests for Admissions (Flaherty, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Brian M. Bideau, John Blair, Peggy Brotherton, Robert Brotherton, Christine Brungardt, Cheryl Burk, LeRoy Burk, David Burnett, Gina Burnett, Chetopa 14, LLC, Bryan Coover, Debra Coover, Dustan E. Dyke, Dustie Elsworth, Diann Fisher, Judy Fulps, Belinda Garten, Cody Garten, Max Grossnickle, Martha Hizey, Ray Hizey, Margaret Denise Houghton, Rex A. Houghton, Dona D Jeffrey, Stephen D. Jeffrey, Jeb Kaufman, Ed Lacen, Brian McCracken, Charles W. Morse, Dillon Rapp, Douglas Q. Reed, Brenda Rice, Robert L. Rice, II, Troy A. Russell, Shawn Sexton, James J. Simon, Kristian D. Van Meteren, Martin D. Volz, G. Darren Wallace, Chad L. Warner, Kimberly Whittley, Michaela Whitworth, Nathan Whitworth, Ronald Winkler, Terri Winkler of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Defendant (Hughes, Patrick)
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC(Flaherty, James)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC (Flaherty, James)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/2/19. (alm)
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Neosho Ridge Wind LLC.(Flaherty, James)
July 29, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
July 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTENT TO REMOVE by James G. Flaherty on behalf of Neosho Ridge Wind LLC (Flaherty, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Neosho Ridge Wind LLC. (Flaherty, James)
July 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Neosho County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000033 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4875006.), filed by Neosho Ridge Wind LLC.(Flaherty, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coover et al v. Neosho Ridge Wind LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Hizey
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diann Fisher
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michaela Whitworth
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Whittley
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Brotherton
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Max Grossnickle
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad L. Warner
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Winkler
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dona D Jeffrey
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Q. Reed
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian McCracken
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Darren Wallace
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy A. Russell
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Rapp
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Winkler
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin D. Volz
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chetopa 14, LLC
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Sexton
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Coover
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Rice
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Garten
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Burnett
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristian D. Van Meteren
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Garten
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James J. Simon
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Brotherton
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles W. Morse
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Burk
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeb Kaufman
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Whitworth
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustie Elsworth
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Blair
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Denise Houghton
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustan E. Dyke
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen D. Jeffrey
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M. Bideau
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Burnett
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRoy Burk
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert L. Rice, II
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Coover
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Lacen
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Fulps
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rex A. Houghton
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Brungardt
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Hizey
Represented By: Patrick B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neosho Ridge Wind LLC
Represented By: James G. Flaherty
Represented By: Kristina J Branstetter
Represented By: Ronald S. Ryburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?