Ritchie v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Plaintiff: Joey L Ritchie
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Walmart Inc
Case Number: 5:2019cv04067
Filed: August 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 23 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, filed by Joey L Ritchie.(McGivern, Sean)
September 24, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) by Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 02:30 PM by telephone (CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749; ACCESS CODE 3977627) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 9/11/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 9/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/27/19. (ks)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart Inc. (Hedican, Christopher)
August 2, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Sean M. McGivern on behalf of Joey L Ritchie. (McGivern, Sean)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 Letter from the clerk to counsel regarding pro hac vice requirements. (mls)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-00682. Electronic file. (mls)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Marginal Entry Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/19 granting plaintiff's unopposed motion to transfer venue to the United States District of Kansas. The 5/23/19 case management conference is canceled. (Related Doc. #13 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Stipulation & Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/22/19 approving the parties' stipulation to correct defendant's name. (Related Doc. #12 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
May 20, 2019 Filing 14 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed Motion to change/transfer venue with Memorandum in Support filed by Plaintiff Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Stipulation to Correct Defendant's Name filed by Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 5/6/19 granting defendant's unopposed motion to continue the 5/16/19 case management conference due to a scheduling conflict. IMPORTANT: Said hearing reset to 5/23/19 at 12:00 p.m., Chambers 18A. (Related Doc. #11 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Setting Mediation - Moss, #2 Proposed Order)(Bulea, Donald)[Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Order [non-document] entered by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/30/19 granting plaintiff's unopposed motion to continue the 5/1/19 case management conference. IMPORTANT: Said conference reset to 5/16/19 at 12:30 p.m., Chambers 18A. (Related Doc. #10 ) (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed Motion to continue Case Management Conference filed by Plaintiff Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 Attorney Appearance by Matthew S. Grimsley filed by on behalf of Joey L Ritchie. (Grimsley, Matthew) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 Amended Answer to Plaintff's Complaint filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. Related document(s) #1 , #6 . (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 Answer to Complaint (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Walmart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Discovery Protocol Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order signed by Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19 setting a conference for 5/9/19 at 9:00 a.m., Chambers 18A. IMPORTANT: The parties are advised to carefully read this Order. The Court requires the attendance of (1) all parties, (2) lead counsel and (3) a representative with full authority for settlement purposes. (Attachments: #1 Parties' Planning Meeting Report, #2 Local Civil Rule 30.1)(D,MA)[Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.]
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Consent Package issued on behalf of Judge James S. Gwin on 4/3/19. (D,MA) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Magistrate Consent Form issued. (Y,A) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.] (mls).
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Cuyahoga County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV 19 911393 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-9223332.. Filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint) (Bulea, Donald) [Transferred from Ohio Northern on 8/1/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritchie v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joey L Ritchie
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?