Fisher v. Russell Stover Chocolates, LLC
Plaintiff: Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr.
Defendant: Russell Stover Chocolates, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04075
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number T4631013202. (kkw)
September 26, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: BY THE DIRECTION OF THE HONORABLE SAM A. CROW, U.S. DISTRICT SENIOR JUDGE Plaintiff is to submit the filing fee by October 10, 2019. Re 5 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 9/26/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Entered by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/23/19. Plaintiff to submit the filing fee. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)
September 11, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ks)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr. is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification. (gw)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(ctv)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr. (ctv)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr.(ctv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Russell Stover Chocolates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert DeVan Fisher, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Stover Chocolates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?