Flaitz et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Plaintiff: CARRIE BETTLES and EDWARD FLAITZ
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04106
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 1/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/6/19. (ala)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Capital One Financial Corporation as corporate parent . (Rummage, Ryan)
December 5, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A..(Rummage, Ryan)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Edward Flaitz, Carrie Bettles upon Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. served on 11/14/2019, answer due 12/5/2019 (Haas, J.)
November 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kkw)
November 11, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs CARRIE BETTLES, EDWARD FLAITZ - trial to be held in Topeka. (Haas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs CARRIE BETTLES, EDWARD FLAITZ. (Haas, J.)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4977277.), filed by EDWARD FLAITZ, CARRIE BETTLES.(Haas, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flaitz et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE BETTLES
Represented By: J. D. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD FLAITZ
Represented By: J. D. Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?