McGee (ID 113662) v. Collett et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Alexander McGee
Defendant: (fnu) Jackson, (fnu) Collett, A. Wilson and (fnu) MacKenslee
Case Number: 5:2020cv03059
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court by Plaintiff Antonio Alexander McGee. (smnd)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #2 & #4 are granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/25/20. Mailed to pro se party Antonio Alexander McGee by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Antonio Alexander McGee. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Banking Transaction History) (smnd)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Antonio Alexander McGee by regular mail. Response deadline 3/23/2020. (smnd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Antonio Alexander McGee. (smnd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Antonio Alexander McGee. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGee (ID 113662) v. Collett et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) MacKenslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Alexander McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?