Davis (ID 06598) v. Schnurr
Petitioner: Anthony Leroy Davis
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Case Number: 5:2020cv03269
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File for Expansion of Record by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Anthony Leroy Davis by regular mail. Response deadline 11/30/2020. (smnd)
October 30, 2020 HABEAS FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631014276. (jsh)
October 29, 2020 Filing 6 POVERTY AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of an Application to Supplement and Amend Pleadings by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Anthony Leroy Davis. (smnd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2020: #1 Exhibits A-B) (smnd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis (ID 06598) v. Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Leroy Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?