Colt Energy, Inc. et al v. Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wild River Energy, LLC and Colt Energy, Inc.
Defendant: Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv04059
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Colt Energy, Inc., Wild River Energy, LLC of Notice of Good Faith Settlment Offer (Thompson, Lee)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time five days. Discovery deadline 5/31/2021. Dispositive motion deadline 7/30/2021. Mediation deadline 4/30/2021. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 3/12/2021. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 6/9/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Holly L. Teeter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/17/20. (aw)
November 17, 2020 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 11/17/2020 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749, enter ACCESS CODE 5407703. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/10/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/10/2020. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/6/20. (aw)
October 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc..(Woods, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal by Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Woods, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc. identifying Southern Star Central Corp. as corporate parent . (Woods, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Woods, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.. (Woods, Samantha)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allen Count District Court, case number 2020-CV-000039 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5271949.), filed by Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Woods, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colt Energy, Inc. et al v. Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wild River Energy, LLC
Represented By: Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colt Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Star Central Gas Pipeline, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha M. H. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?