USA v. Drake et al
Plaintiff: USA USA and USA
Defendant: Julie L Drake, Richard S Drake and Drake CPA, LLC
Case Number: 5:2020cv04076
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 2/9/2021 for Defendants Drake CPA, LLC, Julie L Drake, Richard S Drake to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 1/15/2021. (jsh)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Drake CPA, LLC. Drake CPA, LLC waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Morgan, Melanie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Julie L Drake. Julie L Drake waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Morgan, Melanie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Richard S Drake. Richard S Drake waiver sent on 11/24/2020, answer due 1/25/2021. (Morgan, Melanie)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Melanie S. Morgan on behalf of Julie L Drake, Richard S Drake, Drake CPA, LLC (Morgan, Melanie)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Richard S Drake served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (mls)
January 11, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service upon Drake CPA, LLC served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (mls)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by USA upon Julie L Drake served on 1/11/2021, answer due 2/1/2021. (mls)
December 30, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Julie L Drake, Richard S Drake, Drake CPA, LLC. (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Toby Crouse for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 12/9/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
November 24, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons, a Waiver of Service of Summons, and copies of the Complaint, ECF Filing Notice, Designation of Place of Trial, and Certificate of Mailing by USA. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff USA - trial to be held in Topeka. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
November 23, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff USA. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by USA.(Sheedy, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Drake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L Drake
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard S Drake
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake CPA, LLC
Represented By: Melanie S. Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA USA
Represented By: Kathryn E. Sheedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Kathryn E. Sheedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?