Lowery et al v. Kansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: John Anthony Wallingford, Ramaun Johnson, John E. Mitchell, Don McAlister, Preston M. Stotler, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Vondell L. Simmons, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, Charles Ross, James H. Hill, Arthur Marks, Kyle R. Klofstad, Dustin Robinson, Brandon Sublett, Major Blango, Terrell Clark, Jesse A. Phillips, David M. Payne, David A. Thomas, Jr., Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Ryan VanDuisen, William Cody Henshaw and Robert W. Meyer
Defendant: Todd Thomason, James Colgan, (fnu) (lnu), E. Elaine Hulley, (fnu) King, Megan Williams, Kansas, State of, Benjamin N. Casad, Gerald Kuckleman and Leavenworth, County of
Case Number: 5:2021cv03107
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER ENTERED: The motions (Docs. #40 , #41 ) filed by Plaintiffs Pemberton and McAlister are granted to the extent that the Court waives the initial partial filing fees for both Plaintiffs. The motions are denied as moot to the extent Plaintiffs seek an extension of time to submit the fee. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/11/21. Mailed to pro se party Phillip Pemberton and Don McAlister by regular mail. (smnd)
June 10, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Order to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Don McAlister. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 10, 2021 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Phillip Pemberton. (smnd)
June 9, 2021 Filing 39 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #38 dismissing matter. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 06/09/21. Mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister, Dustin Robinson, David A. Thomas, Jr., David M. Payne, Jesse A. Phillip, Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Robert W. Meyer, Ryan VanDuisen, Terrell Clark and William Cody Henshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
June 9, 2021 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff Lowery's motion to amend complaint (Doc. #25 ) is denied. This matter is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/09/21. Mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister, Dustin Robinson, David A. Thomas, Jr., David M. Payne, Jesse A. Phillip, Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Robert W. Meyer, Ryan VanDuisen, Terrell Clark and William Cody Henshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
June 8, 2021 Filing 37 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Phillip Pemberton re #13 Memorandum and Order and Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 8, 2021 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Terrell Clark re #13 Memorandum and Order and Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 4, 2021 Filing 35 DOCKET ANNOTATION: In response to the #14 Order filed 05/11/21, the Sheriff of the Leavenworth County Jail provided six-month account statements to the Clerk of the Court for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Marks Inmate Account Statement, #2 Sublett Inmate Account Statement, #3 Ross Inmate Account Statement, #4 Thomas Inmate Account Statement, #5 Payne Inmate Account Statement, #6 McAlister Inmate Account Statement, #7 Robinson Inmate Account Statement, #8 Hill Inmate Account Statement, #9 Phillips Inmate Account Statement, #10 Wallingford Inmate Account Statement, #11 Mitchell Inmate Account Statement, #12 Klofstad Inmate Account Statement, #13 Lowery Inmate Account Statement, #14 Blango Inmate Account Statement, #15 Holmes Inmate Account Statement, #16 Ozment Inmate Account Statement, #17 Pemberton Inmate Account Statement, #18 Stotler Inmate Account Statement, #19 Johnson Inmate Account Statement, #20 Meyer Inmate Account Statement, #21 VanDuisen Inmate Account Statement, #22 Clark Inmate Account Statement, #23 Simmons Inmate Account Statement, #24 Henshaw Inmate Account Statement, #25 Watts Inmate Account Statement, #26 Envelope) (smnd)
June 3, 2021 Filing 34 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff James H. Hill. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Court, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
June 3, 2021 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James H. Hill re #13 Memorandum and Order and Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The following Plaintiffs are dismissed from this action: John Anthony Wallingford; Matthew G. Ozment; Vondell L. Simmons; Dustin Robinson; Charles Ross; Ramaun Johnson; James H. Hill; Zara F. Watts, III; Major Blango; John E. Mitchell; Kyle R. Klofstad; Preston M. Stotler; Brandon Sublett; Arthur Marks; David A. Thomas, Jr.; Ryan VanDuisen; William Cody Henshaw; and Terrell Clark. Plaintiff Stotler's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #8 ) is denied. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister, Dustin Robinson, David A. Thomas, Jr., David M. Payne, Jesse A. Phillip, Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Robert W. Meyer, Ryan VanDuisen, Terrell Clark and William Cody Henshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #12 is granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Jesse A. Phillips by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #23 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $11.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including June 16, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Don McAlister by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis #15 & #22 are granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $56.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including June 16, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Robert W. Meyer by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #20 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $21.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including June 16, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Phillip Pemberton by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 1, 2021 Filing 27 RETURN mail received re #13 Memorandum and Order and #14 Order addressed to Plaintiff William Cody Henshaw (Return to Sender/Unable to Forward); Remailed to Plaintiff Henshaw at El Dorado Correctional Facility (Current Location Pursuant to KDOC). (smnd)
May 27, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Don McAlister re #13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
May 27, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff LaJuan S.L. Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (jal)
May 27, 2021 Filing 24 SUPPLEMENT to #12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jesse A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(jal)
May 27, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Don McAlister. (Attachments: #1 Transaction Detail Report, #2 Envelope) (jal)
May 27, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert W. Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Transaction Detail Report, #2 Envelope) (jal)
May 24, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Plaintiff Phillip Pemberton to the Court. (jal)
May 24, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Phillip Pemberton. (Attachments: #1 Transaction Detail Report, #2 Envelope) (jal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2021: #3 Complete Main Document) (jal).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #11 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $26.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including June 3, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/20/21. Mailed to pro se party Marquis B. Holmes by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #16 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $10.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including June 3, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/20/21. Mailed to pro se party David M. Payne by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
May 19, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 5/19/2021. Receipt number T4631014819, in the amount of $ 6.00. (mls)
May 19, 2021 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marquis B. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 19, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David M. Payne. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
May 17, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert W. Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Handwritten Copy of Institutional Deposits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ENTERED: The Court directs the Sheriff of the Leavenworth County Jail to provide a six-month account statement to the Clerk of the Court for Plaintiffs Holmes and Phillips, and to provide the statement for any additional Plaintiff in this case that requests one. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/11/21. Mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister, Dustin Robinson, David A. Thomas, Jr., David M. Payne, Jesse A. Phillip, Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Robert W. Meyer, Ryan VanDuisen, Terrell Clark and William Cody Henshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff Lowery's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. #5 ) is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff Lowery's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #10 ) is granted. Plaintiff Lowery must submit the $6.00 initial partial filing fee by May 27, 2021. Failure to submit the fee by that date may result in dismissal without prejudice and without further notice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Plaintiff Lowery's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) is moot and therefore denied. Plaintiffs Stotler, Holmes and Phillips must submit their six-month account statement by May 27, 2021. Failure to submit the account statement by that date may result in dismissal without further notice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). All remaining Plaintiffs must submit a proper motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, including the six-month account statement, by May 27, 2021. Any Plaintiff failing to submit a proper motion with the required account statement by that date will be dismissed without further notice under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Plaintiffs are granted until June 8, 2021, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why Plaintiffs' Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/11/21. Mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister, Dustin Robinson, David A. Thomas, Jr., David M. Payne, Jesse A. Phillip, Marquis B. Holmes, Phillip Pemberton, Robert W. Meyer, Ryan VanDuisen, Terrell Clark and William Cody Henshaw by regular mail. (smnd) Modified text on 5/11/2021. (smnd)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jesse A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Marquis B. Holmes. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk of the Court, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
May 6, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff LaJuan S.L. Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 27, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Preston M. Stotler by regular mail. Response deadline 5/27/2021. (smnd)
April 27, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Preston M. Stotler. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party David M. Payne, David A. Thomas, Jr, Ryan VanDuisen, Marquis B. Holmes, William Cody Henshaw, Robert W. Meyer, Jesse A. Phillips, Phillip Pemberton and Terrell Clark by regular mail. Response deadline 5/26/2021. (smnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party LaJuan S.L. Lowery by regular mail. Response deadline 5/26/2021. (smnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff LaJuan S.L. Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff LaJuan S.L. Lowery. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT Adding Plaintiffs to #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs LaJuan S.L. Lowery, David M. Payne, David A. Thomas, Jr, Ryan VanDuisen, Marquis B. Holmes, William Cody Henshaw, Robert W. Meyer, Jesse A. Phillips, Phillip Pemberton and Terrell Clark. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister and Dustin Robinson by regular mail. Response deadline 5/19/2021. (smnd)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Major Blango, Ramaun Johnson, John Anthony Wallingford, LaJuan S.L. Lowery, Kyle R. Klofstad, Arthur Marks, Charles Ross, Matthew G. Ozment, Zara F. Watts, III, John E. Mitchell, Preston M. Stotler, Brandon Sublett, James H. Hill, Vondell L. Simmons, Don McAlister and Dustin Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lowery et al v. Kansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Colgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Elaine Hulley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin N. Casad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Kuckleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leavenworth, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Anthony Wallingford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramaun Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preston M. Stotler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaJuan S.L. Lowery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vondell L. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Ozment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zara F. Watts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle R. Klofstad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Sublett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Major Blango
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse A. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David M. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Thomas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquis B. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Pemberton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan VanDuisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Cody Henshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert W. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?