Lenhardt v. Democratic Party HQ et al
Plaintiff: Ursula Lenhardt
Defendant: Joseph Biden, Democratic Party HQ, Barack Obama, Elizabeth Warren, Hillary Clinton and Kamala Harris
Case Number: 5:2021cv04001
Filed: January 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed by Ursula Lenhardt. Response deadline 3/29/2021. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 3/11/2021. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 1928 1083. (jal)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, 6 Order addressed to Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (jal)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (jal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2021: #1 Document Copy with Physical Signature) (jal).
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #4 Motion to Supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/25/2021. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail and certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 0003 1928 1762. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry. See Docket Entry #5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for a copy of the order.) (jal)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ursula Lenhardt. Objections to R&R due by 3/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 2/25/2021. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail and by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7010 2780 0003 1928 1762. (jal)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Supplement re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (jal) Modified on 2/18/2021 to correct filing date (jal). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2021: #1 Scanned copy bearing original signatures) (jal).
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (jsh)
January 19, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (jsh)
January 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Ursula Lenhardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - text messages) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenhardt v. Democratic Party HQ et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Biden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Democratic Party HQ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillary Clinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Lenhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?