Jones v. Patents and Trademarks Commissioner
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Defendant: Patents and Trademarks Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2021cv04021
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Filing 17 OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones(ctv)
May 21, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, addressed to Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (jal)
May 18, 2021 Filing 15 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Lee Jones. Objections to R&R due by 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 5/18/2021. Mailed to Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones by certified mail; certified mail # 7010 2780 0003 1928 1977. (ht)
May 17, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones: now at Shawnee County Jail, 501 S.E. 8th Street, Topeka, Kansas 66607. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 30, 2021 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #9 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
April 26, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (jal)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Withdrawing #9 Report and Recommendations Regarding #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. In light of plaintiff's #10 response to #6 the court's order directing plaintiff to pay the filing fee or to show cause, the court withdraws the pending Report and Recommendations and will take up the motion in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/23/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ht)
April 22, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones re #6 Order. (Attachments: #1 Attached Order Copy, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (jal)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Joseph Lee Jones. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. Objections to R&R due by 5/5/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/21/2021. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (jal)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN Mail received re 4 Order of Recusal, addressed to Joseph Lee Jones. Remailed on 4/21/2021 to updated address per Notice of Address Change. (kas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter and Notice of Deficiency Copy, #2 Envelope) (jal)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff Jones shall pay the $402 filing fee by May 15, 2021, or shall show cause in writing why the court should not recommend to the assigned district judge that his case be dismissed without prejudice for failing to pay the required filing fee. If Jones fails to pay the filing fee or show cause by this deadline, the court will likely recommend that this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 4/14/2021. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (jal)
April 12, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/12/2021.Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones 36813 LARNED State Hospital Isaac Ray Building 1301 KS Highway 264 by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
April 9, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and Form AO 120 are missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Notice and copies of required forms mailed to pro se plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (jsh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (jsh)
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Joseph Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Memorandum of Law/Fact, #3 Envelope, #4 Exhibits) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Patents and Trademarks Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patents and Trademarks Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?