United States of America v. New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Elizabeth Aldrine, Kathleen Nibler, Patricia Dowd-Kelne, Cara Schroeder, The Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of both Mary Kay Bachmann-Dowd, a/k/a Mary Kay Bachmann, deceased, and Matthew J. Dowd, deceased, a, Michael Dowd, Trish Dowd-Kelne, The Unknown Occupants of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, Barbara A. Turner, The Unknown General Partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, Robert E. Cote, Terie L. Elkins, Donald E. McIntyre, Tara Wineinger, Barbara L. Stephens, Ty Bachmann, Alice M. Newport, Liz Aldrine, Kathy Nibler, the Known and Unknown limited partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership, Judy A. Dowd, Donna L. Picolet, Timothy Newport, Waltraut E. Kinson, Matthew J. Gorski and Florence H. Bridgmon
Case Number: 5:2021cv04031
Filed: May 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Kathryn H Vratil
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2021 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021 by serving Kansas Secretary of State pursuant to K.S.A. 60-304(f) (Sheedy, Kathryn)
July 6, 2021 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Sheedy, Kathryn)
July 1, 2021 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Judy A. Dowd waiver sent on 6/9/2021, answer due 8/9/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Donna L. Picolet waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Barbara A. Turner waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Barbara L. Stephens waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Florence H. Bridgmon waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Terie L. Elkins waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Donald E. McIntyre waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Matthew J. Gorski waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Waltraut E. Kinson waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
June 17, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Tara Wineinger waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 17, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Ty Bachmann waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 17, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Cara Schroeder waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 17, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Patricia Dowd-Kelne waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Elizabeth Aldrine waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Michael Dowd waiver sent on 5/24/2021, answer due 7/23/2021. (Sheedy, Kathryn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/17/2021: #1 Correct document) (mls).
June 9, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service of Summons on Defendant Judy Dowd by United States of America (Sheedy, Kathryn)
May 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
May 24, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service of Summons, Complaint and Certificate by United States of America. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Elizabeth Aldrine, Ty Bachmann, Florence H. Bridgmon, Robert E. Cote, Judy A. Dowd, Michael Dowd, Patricia Dowd-Kelne, Terie L. Elkins, Matthew J. Gorski, Waltraut E. Kinson, Donald E. McIntyre, New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership, Alice M. Newport, Timothy Newport, Kathleen Nibler, Donna L. Picolet, Cara Schroeder, Barbara L. Stephens, The Unknown General Partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, The Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of both Mary Kay Bachmann-Dowd, a/k/a Mary Kay Bachmann, deceased, and Matthew J. Dowd, deceased, a, The Unknown Occupants of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, Barbara A. Turner, Tara Wineinger, the Known and Unknown limited partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Sheedy, Kathryn)
May 18, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
May 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sheedy, Kathryn)
May 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Sheedy, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Aldrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Nibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Dowd-Kelne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Heirs, Executors, Administrators, Devisees, Trustees, Legatees, Creditors, and Assignees of both Mary Kay Bachmann-Dowd, a/k/a Mary Kay Bachmann, deceased, and Matthew J. Dowd, deceased, a
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Dowd-Kelne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown Occupants of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara A. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Unknown General Partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terie L. Elkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald E. McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Wineinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara L. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Bachmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice M. Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Aldrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Nibler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the Known and Unknown limited partners of New Place II, a Kansas limited partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Place II, a Kansas Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy A. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna L. Picolet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waltraut E. Kinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew J. Gorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence H. Bridgmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kathryn E. Sheedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?