Brown v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: Sheleena Marie Brown
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 5:2021cv04040
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1383
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served by Personal Service on 7/19/2021. Answer due 9/17/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. (jsh)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail (USM-285) on 7/8/2021. Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (jsh)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail (USM-285) on 7/7/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (jsh)
July 12, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: On July 9, 2021, Kilolo Kijakazi was named acting Commissioner of Social Security replacing Andrew M. Saul. The party text for the defendant Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, has been updated to reflect this change (msb)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue summons to the US Marshal or Deputy Marshal, who are appointed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(c)(3). Plaintiff(s) or plaintiff(s) counsel directed to IMMEDIATELY prepare and submit summon(s) to the Clerk for service. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/17/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
June 17, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to US Marshal for service). (jsh)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sheleena Marie Brown. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status) (jsh)
June 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Sheleena Marie Brown. (jsh)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Sheleena Marie Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheleena Marie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?