United States of America v. Orange Grove Apartments, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Orange Grove Apartments, L.P., Roean, Inc., W.R. Reeves, Jr., Jean A. Reeves, John G. Wurth, Jetz Service Co., Inc., Affordable Housing Investments, Inc., Affordable Housing Management, Inc., Nathan Manville, Zonie L. Ruggero, Frederick D. Large, Carol M. Riley, Jason T. Perryman, Jonathan A. Field, Unknown Occupants of Orange Grove Apartments, L.P. and Unknown Defendants
Case Number: 5:2021cv04043
Filed: July 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon Affordable Housing Management, Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021 (Sinclair, Luke)
September 15, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by United States of America upon Affordable Housing Investments, Inc. served on 8/20/2021, answer due 9/10/2021 (Sinclair, Luke)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service (USM-285) by United States of America upon W.R. Reeves, Jr. Served on 9/10/2021. Answer due 10/1/2021. (jsh)
September 7, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by United States of America upon Jetz Service Co., Inc. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (jsh)
September 2, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to W.R. Reeves, Jr. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
August 19, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Unknown Occupants of Orange Grove Apartments, L.P.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
August 16, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Affordable Housing Investments, Inc., Affordable Housing Management, Inc., Jetz Service Co., Inc., Orange Grove Apartments, L.P., Roean, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
August 13, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jonathan A. Field waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jason T. Perryman waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Carol M. Riley waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Frederick D. Large waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Zonie L. Ruggero waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nathan Manville waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. John G. Wurth waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
August 13, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Jean A. Reeves waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Sinclair, Luke)
July 21, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit and Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Sinclair, Luke)
July 21, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Sinclair, Luke)
July 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Promise, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment)(Sinclair, Luke)
July 21, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Orange Grove Apartments, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Luke P. Sinclair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Grove Apartments, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roean, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.R. Reeves, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean A. Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John G. Wurth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetz Service Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Housing Investments, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affordable Housing Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zonie L. Ruggero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick D. Large
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol M. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason T. Perryman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan A. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Occupants of Orange Grove Apartments, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?