Carson v. Gissi et al
Plaintiff: Tina Carson
Defendant: Blair T Gissi, Faye Servicing LLC, Richard Beheler, Gregory Funding, Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2018F, US Bank National Association, James T McIntyre and Judge Herron
Case Number: 5:2021cv04053
Filed: August 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 REVISED CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Tina Carson. (jsh)
August 20, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 8/20/2021. Mailed to pro se party Tina Carson by regular mail. (kas)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 8/19/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
August 19, 2021 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Tina Carson - trial to be held in Topeka. (jsh)
August 19, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402, receipt number T4631015003 (jsh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction ( Response deadline 9/1/2021) by Plaintiff Tina Carson (jsh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Tina Carson. (jsh)
August 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Tina Carson. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Gissi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Carson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blair T Gissi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faye Servicing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Beheler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajax Mortgage Loan Trust 2018F
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James T McIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?