Webster et al v. Palk et al
Plaintiff: Shirley Dione Webster, Dwayne Marvin Garrett and Paul Leroy Wickham
Defendant: Scott Palk, Charles B. Goodwin, Jack W. Dishman, Bernard M. Jones, John F. Hull, David L. Russell, Wayne E. Alley, Robin J. Cauthron and Kenny Butman
Case Number: 5:2021cv04057
Filed: August 31, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
2 Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE re Eastern District of Oklahoma Case #CIV-21-119-SLP by Paul Leroy Wickham. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet) (jsh)
October 25, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #18 Memorandum and Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Paul Leroy Wickham. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet) (jsh)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' motions to supplement pleadings (Doc. #3 ), for Speedy Trial Act (Doc. #14 ), and for extra data (Doc. #17 ) are DENIED. Plaintiffs are directed to show cause in writing on or before November 15, 2021, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Failure to show good cause within that specified time may result in dismissal of the action without further notice. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 10/20/2021. Mailed to pro se parties Dwayne Marvin Garrett at PO Box 554 Coffeyville, KS 67337, Paul Leroy Wickham at Rt 1 Box 171 Nowata, OK 74048 and Shirley Dione Webster at PO Box 217 HC61 Lenapah, OK 74042 by regular mail. (mam)
September 29, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Order (titled, "Motion for extra data") by Plaintiff Paul Leroy Wickham. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jsh)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE (titled "In existing cases 21-CV-04057-JWB-ADM and CIV-21-119-SLP") by Paul Leroy Wickham. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jsh)
September 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE (titled "In the existing Case of CIV-119-SLP Objection") by Paul Leroy Wickham (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Envelope) (jsh)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Speedy Trial Act in Case No. CIV-21-119-SLP by Plaintiff Paul Leroy Wickham. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (jsh)
September 10, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/10/21. Mailed to pro se plaintiffs Shirley Webster, Dewayne Garrett, and Paul Wickham by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(kao)
September 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Scott Palk. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Charles B. Goodwin. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Jack W. Dishman. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Bernard M. Jones. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon John F. Hull. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon David L. Russell. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Wayne E. Alley. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Robin J. Cauthron. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Service by FedEx by Paul Leroy Wickham upon Kenny Butman. Served on 9/3/2021. Answer due 9/24/2021. (jsh)
September 9, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Supplement Pleadings by Plaintiff Paul Leroy Wickham (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jsh)
August 31, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Dwayne Marvin Garrett, Shirley Dione Webster, Paul Leroy Wickham. (jsh)
August 31, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Paul Leroy Wickham, Dwayne Marvin Garrett, Shirley Dione Webster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jsh)
August 31, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402, receipt number T4631015033. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster et al v. Palk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Dione Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Marvin Garrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Leroy Wickham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Palk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles B. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack W. Dishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Hull
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne E. Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin J. Cauthron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenny Butman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?