Karle v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Plaintiff: ROBERT WILLIAM KARLE
Defendant: Kijakazi and Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Interested Party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Case Number: 5:2021cv04062
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 427
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/4/2021 Social Security Administration, Commissioner of served on 10/4/2021, answer due 12/3/2021. Summons served on United States Attorney. (Brumley, Bruce)
October 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/4/2021 Summons served on Office of the Regional Counsel. (Brumley, Bruce)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/7/2021 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (Brumley, Bruce)
October 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 10/8/2021 Summons served on United States Attorney General. (Brumley, Bruce)
September 29, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (issued to Attorney for service). (jsh)
September 17, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
September 16, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff ROBERT WILLIAM KARLE - trial to be held in Topeka. (Brumley, Bruce)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff ROBERT WILLIAM KARLE. (Brumley, Bruce)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5589760.), filed by ROBERT WILLIAM KARLE.(Brumley, Bruce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karle v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WILLIAM KARLE
Represented By: Bruce Alan Brumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Regional Administrator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?