Ahmed v. Donley et al
Plaintiff: Arjune Ahmed
Defendant: D. Donley, (fnu) Deloiah, (fnu) Gabriel, (fnu) Clark, (fnu) Heartley, (fnu) Carran, (fnu) Shilakter, D. Hudson, (fnu) Jergenson, (fnu) Keller and (fnu) Collins
Interested Party: Warden
Case Number: 5:2022cv03199
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2022 Filing 19 RETURN Mail received re #18 Order, addressed to Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. Returned as: Inmate not at this institution. Not Remailed. (jal)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ENTERED: The motion for extension of time (Doc. #17 ) is granted. The Martinez report shall be filed with this Court on or before December 12, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/27/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail. (smnd)
October 27, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION for extension of time to File Martinez Report by Interested Party Warden (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Allman, Christopher)
October 21, 2022 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Allman on behalf of Warden. (Allman, Christopher)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion (Doc. #13 ) is granted. The initial partial filing fee of $8.00 is waived. Plaintiff may pay the filing fee by payments automatically deducted from his institutional account by the agency having custody of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/12/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail. (smnd)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Officials responsible for the operation of USPL are directed to undertake a review Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #12 ). Upon completion of the review, a written report shall be compiled which shall be filed with the Court within thirty days of the date of this Order and served on Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall enter the USPL Warden as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez Report. Upon the filing of that report, the Warden may move for termination from this action. Defendants Deloiah, Gabriel, Clark, Heartley, Carran, Shilakter, Jergenson, Keller, and Collins are dismissed from this matter due to Plaintiff's failure to state a claim against them on which relief may be granted. The sole remaining claim in this matter is Plaintiff's claim in Count I against Defendant Donley. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/11/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed and USPL Warden by regular mail; e-mailed to the United States Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd)
October 11, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION to Waive Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
October 6, 2022 Filing 12 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against (fnu) Carran, (fnu) Clark, (fnu) Collins, (fnu) Deloiah, D. Donley, (fnu) Gabriel, (fnu) Heartley, (fnu) Jergenson, (fnu) Keller and (fnu) Shilakter filed by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd) Modified text to clarify Second Amended Complaint on 10/11/2022. (smnd)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $8.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including October 17, 2022, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/03/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
October 3, 2022 Filing 10 PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including October 28, 2022, to file a complete and proper second amended complaint to cure the deficiencies. The clerk is directed to send Bivens forms and instructions to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/28/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail with Bivens forms and instructions. (smnd)
September 26, 2022 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against (fnu) Carran, (fnu) Collins, (fnu) Deloiah, D. Donley, (fnu) Gabriel, (fnu) Heartley, D. Hudson, (fnu) Jergenson, (fnu) Keller, (fnu) Shilakter, filed by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including October 13, 2022, to file a complete and proper amended complaint on court-approved forms. The clerk is directed to send Bivens forms and instructions to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/20/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail with Bivens forms and instructions. (smnd)
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
September 19, 2022 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including October 13, 2022, to file a complete and proper amended complaint to cure the deficiencies discussed herein. The clerk is directed to send Bivens forms and instructions to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 09/13/22. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail. (smnd)
September 9, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Mailed to pro se party Arjune Ahmed by regular mail. Response deadline 10/11/2022. (jal)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (jal)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Arjune Ahmed. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahmed v. Donley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arjune Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Donley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Deloiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Heartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Carran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Shilakter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Jergenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Warden
Represented By: Christopher Allman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?