Lewis v. Dodge City Community College
Plaintiff: Michael A. Lewis, Jr.
Defendant: Dodge City Community College
Case Number: 5:2022cv03207
Filed: September 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Michael A. Lewis, Jr., #1873651: now at Nottoway Correctional Center, 2892 Schutt Road, P.O. Box 488, Burkeville, Virginia 23922. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Lungstrum no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/14/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
November 14, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Pursuant to Plaintiff's change of address, another copy of the #12 Order filed November 10, 2022, was mailed to Nottoway Correctional Center, 2892 Schutt Road, P.O. Box 488, Burkeville, Virginia 23922, as well as to the finance office at Nottoway Correctional Center. (smnd)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ENTERED: The Court's Memorandum and Order at Doc. #6 and Judgment at Doc. #7 are vacated and this case is reopened. Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docs. #9 , #11 ) are granted. The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where Plaintiff is currently confined, and to the Court's finance office. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/10/22. Mailed to pro se party Michael A. Lewis, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
November 10, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael A. Lewis, Jr. (smnd)
November 10, 2022 Filing 10 COMPLAINT (on court-approved form) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Lewis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
November 3, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Michael A. Lewis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Transaction Statement, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 COMPLAINT (on court-approved form) filed by Plaintiff Michael A. Lewis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 (VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER #12 FILED 11/10/22) -- JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #6 dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/27/22. Mailed to pro se party Michael A. Lewis, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd) Modified text on 11/10/2022. (smnd)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER #12 FILED 11/10/22) -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/27/22. Mailed to pro se party Michael A. Lewis, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd) Modified text on 11/10/2022. (smnd)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Michael A. Lewis, Jr. by regular mail. Response deadline 10/24/2022. (smnd)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:22-cv-00524. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (smnd)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order transferring case to District of Kansas. Signed by Chief Judge Michael F. Urbanski on 9/22/2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(aab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2022.]
September 7, 2022 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Account Report (Incomplete) and Statement of Assets by Michael A. Lewis, Jr (aab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2022.]
September 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983 against Dodge City Community College, filed by Michael A. Lewis, Jr.(aab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 9/23/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Dodge City Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael A. Lewis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge City Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?