Foster (ID 92016) v. Zmuda et al
Plaintiff: Rory Markel Foster and Rory Marcel Foster
Defendant: Jeff Zmuda, Gloria Geither and Immigration and Custom Enforcement
Case Number: 5:2023cv03090
Filed: March 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2023 Filing 13 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on April 25, 2023, and assigned Appeal No. 23-3066 re #11 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Rory Markel Foster. (smnd)
April 25, 2023 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #11 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
April 25, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #9 Memorandum and Order and #10 Judgment by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (smnd)
April 25, 2023 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #11 on behalf of Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
April 21, 2023 Filing 10 JUDGMENT regarding #9 Memorandum and Order dismissing matter for failure to state a claim. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/21/23. Mailed to pro se party Rory Markel Foster by regular mail. (smnd)
April 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/21/23. Mailed to pro se party Rory Markel Foster by regular mail. (smnd)
April 19, 2023 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster re #7 Memorandum and Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit G, #4 Letter to Clerk of the Court) (smnd)
April 6, 2023 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 4/6/2023. Receipt number 500000570, in the amount of $ 15.50. (mls)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted until May 1, 2023, in which to show good cause, in writing to the undersigned, why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 04/04/23. Mailed to pro se party Rory Markel Foster, a/k/a Rory Marcel Foster, by regular mail. (smnd)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $15.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including April 14, 2023, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/31/23. Mailed to pro se party Rory Markel Foster by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
March 30, 2023 Filing 5 Letter to Clerk of District Court from Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (smnd)
March 30, 2023 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (smnd)
March 30, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
March 30, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (smnd)
March 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Rory Markel Foster. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster (ID 92016) v. Zmuda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Markel Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rory Marcel Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Zmuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Geither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Custom Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?