Taylor (ID 40516) v. Easley
Petitioner: Ernest L. Taylor
Respondent: Kansas, State of and Tim Easley
Case Number: 5:2023cv03203
Filed: August 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion for extension of time (Doc. #11 ) is granted. Respondent is granted to and including December 19, 2023 to file the PAR. No further extensions will be granted absent exceptional circumstances. Petitioner is granted to and including January 19, 2024 to file a reply to the PAR if he desires. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/19/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ernest L. Taylor by regular mail. (jal)
October 19, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Respondent Tim Easley (Ailslieger, Kristafer)
September 27, 2023 Filing 10 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #8 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 KDOC Account Withdrawal Request) (smnd)
September 25, 2023 HABEAS FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $5, receipt number 500000932. (nac)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Tim Easley, Warden of Larned State Correctional Facility, where Petitioner is confined, is substituted as Respondent in this matter. Respondent is granted to and including October 20, 2023, in which to file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this order. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/19/23. Mailed to pro se party Ernest L. Taylor by regular mail. (smnd)
September 18, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)
September 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted to and including October 10, 2023 in which to submit under this case number a petition seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241. The failure to timely comply may result in dismissal without further prior notice to Petitioner. The clerk is directed to send Petitioner the court-approved forms for filing a petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241. The motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #5 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/7/2023. Mailed to pro se party Ernest L. Taylor by regular mail. (jal)
September 6, 2023 Filing 6 RESPONSE re #4 Memorandum & Order by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (jal)
September 6, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement, #2 Supplemental Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #3 Exhibit) (jal)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted to and including September 29, 2023 in which to submit either an amended petition seeking relief under 28 U.S.C. 2241 or a written response to this order. The failure to timely comply may result in dismissal without further prior notice to Petitioner. The clerk is directed to send Petitioner the court-approved forms for filing a petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 08/29/23. Mailed to pro se party Ernest L. Taylor with forms to file a petition under 28 U.S.C. 2241 by regular mail. (smnd)
August 28, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Ernest L. Taylor by regular mail. Response deadline 9/27/2023. (smnd)
August 28, 2023 Filing 2 IN FORMA PAUPERIS AFFIDAVIT by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
August 28, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Ernest L. Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor (ID 40516) v. Easley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ernest L. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tim Easley
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?