Jackson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Belinda Jackson
Defendant: Ford Motor Company, Steve Bardell and Long McArthur Ford
Case Number: 5:2023cv04034
Filed: April 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
2 Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT ENTERED: re #25 Memorandum and Order dismissing this case. Signed by deputy clerk on 11/1/2023. (jal)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #17 Motion to Dismiss. The remaining claims are dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. This case is therefore dismissed in its entirety. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/1/2023. (jal)
October 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintif (Brooks, Laura)
October 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson: Re #17 Motion to Dismiss (Reply deadline 10/25/2023) and #20 Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson (Attachments: #1 Answer to Show Cause Order and Motion to Dismiss, #2 Memorandum Brief w/Wet Signature, #3 Answer to Show Cause Order and Motion to Dismiss w/Wet Signature)(msb)
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS. The parties agreed and the Court orders that all discovery and further pretrial proceedings, except for briefing related to the pending motion to dismiss, be temporarily stayed until the District Judge rules on #17 Defendant Long McArthur Ford's motion to dismiss. If the pending motion to dismiss is denied or any claims remain after the District Judge's ruling, defense counsel shall email the chambers of the undersigned Magistrate Judge, within seven (7) days of the ruling, with suggested dates for setting a telephone scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/6/2023.(Mailed to pro se Plaintiff by regular mail.) (byk)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: STATUS CONFERENCE held by telephone on 10/5/2023. See forthcoming Order staying discovery and pretrial proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (byk)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff to show cause in writing, by 10/13/23 why Defendant Long McArthur Ford's motion to dismiss should not be granted as uncontested. Plaintiff shall also file any response to Defendant's motion by 10/13/23. If Plaintiff fails to respond to this Order, or to file a response as directed, the Court will consider the motion to dismiss as uncontested as described in D. Kan. Rule 7.1(c) and it will be granted without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2023. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/3/23. (msb)
September 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/STATUS CONFERENCE: Scheduling/Status Conference set for 10/5/2023 at 01:30 PM (central time) by telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/6/2023. (Mailed to pro se Plaintiff by regular mail.) (byk)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim by Defendant Long McArthur Ford(Michel, Larry)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Claim by Defendant Long McArthur Ford (Michel, Larry)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 8/31/2023 for Defendant Long McArthur Ford to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/16/2023. (jk)
August 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to #13 Answer to Amended Complaint (Titled: Plaintiff's Answer to Defendant's Ford Motor Company and Long McArthur Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson. (ca)
August 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Deborah Belinda Jackson upon Long McArthur Ford served on 7/27/2023, answer due 8/17/2023. (jk)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Brooks, Laura)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY and ORDER from proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/19/2023. Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson appeared pro se. Defendant Ford Motor Company appeared through counsel, Laura K. Brooks. The Court discussed the issue of subject matter jurisdiction in this case, given Plaintiff's #11 Amended Complaint adding Long McArthur Ford, a Kansas corporation, as defendant. After reviewing the Amended Complaint, the Court clarified to the parties that Plaintiff's claims against Long McArthur Ford include a race discrimination claim and her amended Civil Cover Sheet included Federal Question as a basis for jurisdiction. Thus, at this point, it does not appear that the addition of Long McArthur Ford as a party defendant would result in the loss of subject matter jurisdiction. However, the Court instructed Plaintiff that she did not properly serve Defendant Long McArthur Ford by mailing the summons and amended complaint. The Court granted Plaintiff 30 days from the date of this Order to serve Long McArthur Ford and will set another Scheduling Conference once Defendant Long McArthur Ford is properly served under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and answers or otherwise responds to the Amended Complaint. The Court also granted Defendant Ford Motor Company an extension, until August 7, 2023, in which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to #11 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hmg)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Ford Motor Company of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Brooks, Laura)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company, Long McArthur Ford, filed by Deborah Belinda Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(ca)
June 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson. Per pro se filer, the attachment was filed as supporting documents to her complaint. (ca)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE to #6 Answer to Complaint by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson. (kmc)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/19/2023 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participants must dial CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 and enter ACCESS CODE 4901386 to join the conference. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 6/28/2023. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures and Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/1/2023. (byk)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ford Motor Company.(Brooks, Laura)
May 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Deborah Belinda Jackson upon Ford Motor Company served on 5/8/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. (jk)
May 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz no longer assigned to case Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 05/02/2023. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(drk)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ford Motor Company - returned to plaintiff by email for service. Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to plaintiff for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
April 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson is a registered pro se participant with ECF Notifications Only. (gw)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Deborah Belinda Jackson. (jsh)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Deborah Belinda Jackson. (jsh)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jsh)
April 27, 2023 Opinion or Order FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number 200000641. (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Belinda Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Laura K. Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Bardell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Long McArthur Ford
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?