Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The v. Magnolia Health Systems, Inc.
Plaintiff: The Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan a/k/a The Magnolia Health Systems Plan, Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The and Magnolia Health Systems Plan, The
Defendant: Magnolia Health Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2023cv04089
Filed: October 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Brooks G Severson
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting, as unopposed, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Counterclaim and to Modify #16 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling. Answer to Counterclaim due 1/12/2024. A revised Initial Order will be forthcoming. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/7/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
December 7, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and to Modify the Initial Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (Tibbets, Gaye)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/16/2024 at 10:00 PM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 1/5/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 1/5/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 12/4/23. (cc)
December 1, 2023 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent. (Ash, Gregory)
December 1, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint AND COUNTERCLAIM for Reformation against Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The by Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Ash, Gregory)
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Alan R. Dolinko for Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 11/15/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 14, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Alan R. Dolinko to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-6201887.) by Plaintiff Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The (referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alan R. Dolinko, #2 Electronic Filing Registration Form)(Tibbets, Gaye)
November 6, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The. Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. waiver sent on 10/17/2023, answer due 12/18/2023. (Tibbets, Gaye) Modified answer date (mls).
November 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard B. Kaufman for Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 11/3/23. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
November 3, 2023 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC FILING REGISTRATION FORM of Richard Kaufman re #7 motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Weems, Douglas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Richard Kaufman re #7 Motion for attorney Richard Kaufman to appear pro hac vice by Defendant Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Weems, Douglas)
November 3, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Richard Kaufman to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6194150.) by Defendant Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson.) (Weems, Douglas)
November 2, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kyle Klucas on behalf of Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Klucas, Kyle)
November 2, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Douglas M. Weems on behalf of Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (Weems, Douglas)
November 2, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gregory L. Ash on behalf of All Defendants. (Ash, Gregory)
October 17, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Magnolia Health Systems, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
October 10, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
October 9, 2023 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The - trial to be held in Topeka. (Tibbets, Gaye)
October 9, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The. (Tibbets, Gaye)
October 9, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6172810.), filed by Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The. (Tibbets, Gaye)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The v. Magnolia Health Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan a/k/a The Magnolia Health Systems Plan
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Health Systems Employee Group Benefit Plan, The
Represented By: Alan R. Dolinko
Represented By: Forrest James Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnolia Health Systems Plan, The
Represented By: Alan R. Dolinko
Represented By: Forrest James Robinson, Jr.
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Health Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas M. Weems
Represented By: Gregory L. Ash
Represented By: Kyle Klucas
Represented By: Richard B. Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?