Taylor v. Szewc et al
Plaintiff: Kodi Lee Taylor
Defendant: Lily Szewc, Njeri Mwangi, Mark Dupree, Unified Government of Kansas City, Kansas, Bonnie Brightwell, Marrissa Sterling-Fagan and Jannessa Sterling
Case Number: 5:2024cv03009
Filed: January 23, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Kodi Lee Taylor: now at 604 Ohio, Kansas City, Kansas 66101. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kodi Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion (Doc. #4 ) is granted. Plaintiff's initial partial filing fee is waived. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/05/24. Mailed to pro se party Kodi Lee Taylor by regular mail. (smnd)
February 5, 2024 Filing 5 DOCKET ANNOTATION: The pdf documents attached to the original filing of #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee has been blocked from public view; the correct documents have been added to that entry and are attached to this annotation for noticing purposes only. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Kodi Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Envelope) (smnd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2024: #3 Corrected Main Document) (smnd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/5/2024: #4 Corrected Envelope) (smnd).
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $16.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including February 7, 2024, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/24/24. Mailed to pro se party Kodi Lee Taylor by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
January 23, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kodi Lee Taylor. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
January 23, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kodi Lee Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits 1-14, #2 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Szewc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kodi Lee Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lily Szewc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Njeri Mwangi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Kansas City, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnie Brightwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marrissa Sterling-Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jannessa Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?