Sipple Bey et al v. Meyer et al
Plaintiff: Gary Sipple Bey and Annette Sipple
Defendant: William Meyer, Brian Hill, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr., Ken Clark, Southlaw P.C. LLC, Greg Schaefer and Teresa Watson
Case Number: 5:2024cv04015
Filed: February 14, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31 U.S.C. ยง 3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Filing 30 RESPONSE by Defendant Teresa Watson re #25 Motion for Summary Judgment (Parker, Stanley)
April 12, 2024 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Defendants Ken Clark, William Meyer, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer, Southlaw P.C. LLC re #25 Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyer, William)
April 12, 2024 Filing 28 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Meyer, Southlaw, Schaefer, Records and Clark's Motion to Strike and Response #27 to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment #25 and Tresspass Notice #26 by Defendant Brian Hill (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Brzon, Jonathan)
April 11, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION to Strike #26 Notice (Other), #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Doc. 25 and 26 by Defendants Ken Clark, William Meyer, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer, Southlaw P.C. LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyer, William)
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 TRESPASS NOTICE LAND RECLAIM INTEREST AND ACQUISITION by Annette Sipple and Gary Sipple Bey. (mls)
April 5, 2024 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Annette Sipple and Gary Sipple Bey. (mls)
April 4, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #24 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and to Consolidate. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.
April 3, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint and to Consolidate by Defendants Ken Clark, William Meyer, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer, Southlaw P.C. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Meyer, William)
March 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER denying #21 Motion to Stay Discovery by Defendant Teresa Watson. The Court denies Defendant Watson's motion as moot. The Court in a prior case management order, ECF No. 18, stayed the issuance of a scheduling order and the start of discovery pending resolution of the motions to dismiss. The Court directs the Clerk's Office to mail the pro se Plaintiffs a copy of this text entry at the addresses listed on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 03/25/2024. Mailed to pro se parties Gary Sipple Bey and Annette Sipple by regular mail.
March 21, 2024 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Teresa Watson(Parker, Stanley)
March 21, 2024 Filing 21 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Teresa Watson (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Parker, Stanley)
March 21, 2024 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Teresa Watson(Parker, Stanley)
March 21, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ( Response deadline 4/11/2024) by Defendant Teresa Watson (Parker, Stanley)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. The Court notes that Defendants have filed a #16 motion to dismiss and a #17 motion to join in that motion to dismiss, which raise issues relating to the jurisdiction of this Court. Because of the efficiencies to be gained from resolving these issues before discovery takes place, the Court finds good cause to delay issuance of a scheduling order and delay the start of any discovery. The Court will issue, as appropriate, an Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling after the District Judge rules on these pending motions and any forthcoming motions of a similar nature. The Court directs the Clerk's Office to mail the pro se Plaintiffs a copy of this text entry at the addresses listed on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 03/20/2024.Mailed to pro se parties Gary Sipple Bey and Annette Sipple by regular mail. (drk)
March 15, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and #17 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Meyer, Southlaw, Schaefer, Records and Clark's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint MOTION to Consolidate Cases D. Kan. Case 5:23-CV-04108. These motions will be resolved by the District Judge.(drk)
March 14, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Meyer, Southlaw, Schaefer, Records and Clark's, MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint ( Response deadline 4/4/2024), MOTION to Consolidate Cases D. Kan. Case 5:23-CV-04108 ( Response deadline 3/28/2024) by Defendant Brian Hill (Brzon, Jonathan)
March 14, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Complaint ( Response deadline 4/4/2024), MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Response deadline 3/28/2024) by Defendants Ken Clark, William Meyer, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer, Southlaw P.C. LLC (Meyer, William)
March 12, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Annette Sipple and Gary Sipple Bey. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(kas)
March 11, 2024 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 3/26/2024 for Defendant Teresa Watson to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 3/11/2024. Mailed to pro se Plaintiffs Gary Sipple Bey and Annette Sipple at PO Box 67711 Topeka, KS 66667 by regular mail. (jk)
March 11, 2024 Filing 13 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Stanley R. Parker on behalf of Teresa Watson (Parker, Stanley)
March 11, 2024 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bryan Carter Smith on behalf of Teresa Watson. (Smith, Bryan)
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Meyer and Southlaw's, MOTION to Dismiss ( Response deadline 3/28/2024), MOTION to Consolidate Cases D. Kan. Case 5:23-CV-04108 ( Response deadline 3/21/2024) by Defendant Brian Hill (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Brzon, Jonathan)
March 7, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 MOTION for Joinder in Defendants Meyer and Southlaw's MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Consolidate Cases D. Kan. Case 5:23-CV-04108. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.
March 6, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #10 MOTION for Joinder of Meyer and SouthLaw's Motion to Dismiss and to Consolidate. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.
March 5, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Joinder of Defendants Clark, Records, and Schaefer to Defendants Meyer and SouthLaw's #8 Motion to Dismiss and to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Ken Clark, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer. (Meyer, William) Modified docket text on 3/6/2024. (jsh)
March 4, 2024 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 MOTION to Dismiss. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #8 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants William Meyer, Southlaw P.C. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Meyer, William)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss ( Response deadline 3/22/2024), MOTION to Consolidate Cases ( Response deadline 3/15/2024) by Defendants William Meyer, Southlaw P.C. LLC (Meyer, William)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The docket reflects that Plaintiffs have paid the filing fee and summonses have been issued to Plaintiffs for service with complaint. The Court therefore denies the motion as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 2/21/2024. Mailed to pro se parties Gary Sipple Bey and Annette Sipple by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jrh)
February 21, 2024 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ken Clark, Brian Hill, William Meyer, G. Jeffrey Records, Jr, Greg Schaefer, Southlaw P.C. LLC, Teresa Watson. (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
February 21, 2024 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $405.00, receipt number 500001258. (nac)
February 15, 2024 Filing 6 DECLARATION/PROCLAMATION OF INDIAN SOVEREIGNTY AND SELF GOVERNMENT of Gary Sipple Bey in support of #1 Complaint. (msb)
February 14, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Document is not redacted properly. The filing party is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. Mailed to Gary Sipple Bey P.O. Box 67711 Topeka, KS 66667 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (nac)
February 14, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiffs Annette Sipple, Gary Sipple Bey. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit) (nac)
February 14, 2024 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Annette Sipple, Gary Sipple Bey - trial to be held in Topeka. (nac)
February 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Annette Sipple, Gary Sipple Bey. (nac)
February 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Annette Sipple, Gary Sipple Bey. (nac) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/20/2024: #1 Main Document) (nac). Modified on 2/20/2024 to add redacted version of complaint, original was blocked from public view (nac).
February 14, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sipple Bey et al v. Meyer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Sipple Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annette Sipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Meyer
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hill
Represented By: Jonathan C. Brzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Jeffrey Records, Jr.
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southlaw P.C. LLC
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Schaefer
Represented By: William H. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Watson
Represented By: Stanley R. Parker
Represented By: Bryan Carter Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?