Monsour et al v. Menu Maker Foods Inc Featured Case
Plaintiff: Monsour's, Inc.
Defendant: Menu Maker Foods Inc
Case Number: 6:2005cv01204
Filed: June 30, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Crawford
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2010 Filing 251 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT by Monsour's, Inc.. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
July 9, 2010 Filing 250 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Monsour's, Inc. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
July 8, 2010 Filing 249 WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE FILED 7/9/10. MOTION for Attorney Fees Incurred Through the Appeal Pursuant to the Terms of the Underlying Contact by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (FILED IN TENTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS ON 6/7/10) (alm) Modified on 7/12/2010 to add text (alm).
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER of 10CCA as to 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc. Upon consideration, Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees is REMANDED to the district court for a determination of reasonable appellate attorney's fees. (Appeal No. 09-3022) (Attachments: # 1 Motion)(alm)
July 7, 2010 Filing 247 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: affirming decision of the District Court (Appeal No. 09-3022) (Attachments: # 1 Letter from 10CCA)(cs)
July 6, 2010 Filing 246 STIPULATION and Instructions to Citizens Bank & Trust by Menu Maker Foods Inc, Monsour's, Inc.. (Mitchell, Alexander)
June 11, 2010 Filing 245 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Motion by Monsour's, Inc. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
June 3, 2010 Filing 244 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 243 Second MOTION to Supplement for Attorney Fees (Mitchell, Alexander)
June 3, 2010 Filing 243 WITHDRAWN PER NOTICE FILED 6/11/10. Second MOTION to Supplement for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DeVaughn, Dustin) Modified on 6/23/2010 to add text and restrict from view. (alm).
May 13, 2009 Filing 242 LETTER TO 10CCA stating record is complete re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment ( Appeal No. 09-3022) (cs)
May 13, 2009 Filing 241 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter JIM HARPER (Harper, Jim)
May 13, 2009 Filing 240 TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL held 5/1/08 before Judge MARTEN, Court Reporter JIM HARPER, Telephone number 316-265-1534. Transcript purchased by: VAL WACHTEL. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2009. (Harper, Jim) (cs). Modified on 5/13/2009 to add PDF document (cs).
May 13, 2009 Filing 239 TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL held 4/30/08 before Judge MARTEN, Court Reporter JIM HARPER, Telephone number 316-265-1534. Transcript purchased by: VAL WACHTEL. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2009. (Harper, Jim)
May 13, 2009 Filing 238 DISREGARD ENTRY - DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY 239 - TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL held 4-29-08 before Judge MARTEN, Court Reporter HARPER, Telephone number 316-265-1534. Transcript purchased by: VAL WACHTEL. (Harper, Jim) Modified on 5/14/2009 (cs).
May 13, 2009 Filing 237 TRANSCRIPT of JURY TRIAL held 4/29/08 before Judge MARTEN, Court Reporter JIM D. HARPER, Telephone number 315-265-1534. Transcript purchased by: VAL WACHTEL. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2009. (Harper, Jim)
May 13, 2009 Filing 236 TRANSCRIPT of in limine held 4/23/08 before Judge MARTEN, Court Reporter JIM HARPER, Telephone number 316-265-1534. Transcript purchased by: VAL WACHTEL. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/11/2009. (Harper, Jim)
April 9, 2009 Filing 235 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 234 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 13, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 233 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 12, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 232 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 8, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 231 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 7, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 230 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 6, 2009 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
April 9, 2009 Filing 229 TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held May 5, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/8/2009. (jlh)
March 4, 2009 Filing 228 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT by Court Reporter Janese Palmer re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (cs)
March 4, 2009 Filing 227 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing on Motion to Reconsider held 3/12/09 before Judge Monti L. Belot, re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, Court Reporter Janese Palmer. Transcript purchased by: Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (cs)
March 2, 2009 Filing 226 CERTIFICATE OF FILING OF TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held 11/20/2006 before Judge Belot by Court Reporter Cindy Schwemmer (Schwemmer, Cindy)
March 2, 2009 Filing 225 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held 11/20/2006 before Judge Belot, Court Reporter Cindy Schwemmer, Telephone number 316-269-6519. Transcript purchased by: John Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/1/2009. (Schwemmer, Cindy)
February 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 224 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 208 plaintiff's Motion to Supplement. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/19/09. (mss)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 221 Joint Motion to approve escrow, letter of credit, and to stay execution. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/12/09. (mss)
February 9, 2009 Filing 222 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Court Reporter Cindy Schwemmer ordering transcripts of Pretrial proceeding on 11/20/06 re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc () Transcript due by 3/9/2009. (Schwemmer, Cindy)
February 9, 2009 Filing 221 Joint MOTION for Stay of Execution by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Escrow Agreement, # 2 Letter Letter of Credit)(Mitchell, Alexander)
February 9, 2009 Filing 220 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher ordering transcripts of jury trial re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc () Transcript due by 4/10/2009. (jlh)
February 5, 2009 Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Court Reporter Janese Palmer ordering transcripts of pretrial proceedings re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc. Transcript due by 3/2/2009. (cs)
January 28, 2009 Filing 218 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Court Reporter Jim Harper ordering transcripts of trial proceedings of 4/29, 4/30 and 5/1/08; 4/23/08 motion hearing and pretrial conference re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc (09-3022) Transcript due by 3/28/2009. (cs)
January 28, 2009 Filing 217 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Requested pretrial proceeding held 11/20/06 - Cindy Schwemmer, Reporter filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Wachtel, John)
January 28, 2009 Filing 216 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Requested pretrial proceedings held 3/12/07 - Janese Palmer, Reporter filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Wachtel, John)
January 28, 2009 Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Requested trial proceedings May 5, 6, 7, 8, 12 and 13, 2008 filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Wachtel, John)
January 28, 2009 Filing 214 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM: Transcript Requested trial proceedings 4/29, 4/30, 5/1/08; and 4/23/08 motion hearing and pretrial conference filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Wachtel, John)
January 27, 2009 DOCKET ANNOTATION: DISREGARD Docket Entry 213 , Entry of Appearance filed by Monsour's, Inc., as it was filed in error. Accordingly, the Entry is no longer available for viewing. THIS IS FOR NOTICING PURPOSES ONLY. (alm)
January 26, 2009 Filing 213 DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR. ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Dustin L. DeVaughn on behalf of Monsour's, Inc.. (DeVaughn, Dustin) Modified on 1/27/2009 to disregard (alm).
January 23, 2009 Filing 212 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 1/23/09 and assigned Appeal No. 09-3022 re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by Menu Maker Foods Inc. (cs)
January 23, 2009 Filing 211 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re 210 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, (Attachments: # 1 Preliminary ROA)(cs)
January 22, 2009 Filing 210 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 157 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 187 Judgment, 209 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion to Alter Judgment, Order on Motion for New Trial,,,, 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Continue, Motion Hearing,,, by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc. Filing fee $ 455, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001379036. (Wachtel, John)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 192 plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 194 plaintiff's Motion to Compel prejudgment interest; and denying 195 defendant's Motion to Alter Judgment and Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/12/09. (mss)
January 6, 2009 Filing 208 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
August 25, 2008 Filing 207 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Withdrawal of Ground for New Trial) by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
July 21, 2008 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Tracy Graves)(Mitchell, Alexander)
July 11, 2008 Filing 205 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re: 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit B1, # 4 Exhibit C)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
July 10, 2008 Filing 204 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re: 192 MOTION for Attorney Fees (DeVaughn, Dustin)
July 8, 2008 Filing 203 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Merle Lloyd)(Mitchell, Alexander)
June 19, 2008 Filing 202 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 192 MOTION for Attorney Fees (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Exhibit C)(Wachtel, John)
June 18, 2008 Filing 201 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (Mitchell, Alexander)
June 13, 2008 Filing 200 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re: 194 MOTION to Compel Prejudgment Interest (James, Richard)
June 10, 2008 Filing 199 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial (James, Richard)
May 30, 2008 Filing 198 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 194 MOTION to Compel Prejudgment Interest (Mitchell, Alexander)
May 28, 2008 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Please disregard docket entry 196 as it was filed with an incorrect document attached. Counsel refiled docket entry 196 as docket entry 197 with the correct documents attached. This entry is for noticing purposes only. (rm)
May 27, 2008 Filing 197 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 May 12, 2008 transcript)(Mitchell, Alexander)
May 27, 2008 Filing 196 PLEASE DISREGARD THIS DOCKET ENTRY AS THE WRONG DOCUMENT WAS ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. COUNSEL HAS REFILED THE DOCUMENT AS DOCKET ENTRY 197 WITH THE CORRECT PLEADING ATTACHED. THE DOCUMENTS ON THIS ENTRY HAVE BEEN BLOCKED FROM PUBLIC VIEW -- MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment MOTION for New Trial by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 May 12, 2008 transcript)(Mitchell, Alexander) Modified on 5/28/2008 (rm).
May 27, 2008 Filing 195 MOTION to Alter Judgment, MOTION for New Trial ( Response deadline 6/10/2008) by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
May 27, 2008 Filing 194 MOTION to Compel Prejudgment Interest by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
May 21, 2008 Filing 193 TRANSCRIPT of Trial held May 12, 2008 before Judge J. Thomas Marten, Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher, Telephone number 316-269-6202. Transcript purchased by: J. Val Wachtel. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2008. (jh)
May 20, 2008 Filing 192 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
May 14, 2008 Filing 188 Jury Instructions.(jw)
May 13, 2008 ***Civil Case Terminated. (cs)
May 13, 2008 Filing 191 Jury questions filed.(rm)
May 13, 2008 Filing 190 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge J. Thomas Marten: Jury Trial started on 4/29/08 and was completed on 5/13/2008. On 5/7/08 Defendant's motion for a directed verdict was denied. On 5/12/08 the Jury retired to deliberate. On 5/13/08 Jury returned to courtroom with Verdict. All exhibits returned to counsel. (Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher.) (Attachments: # 1 Witnesses and Exhibits) (rm)
May 13, 2008 Filing 189 JURY VERDICT for Monsour's Inc. and against Menu Maker Foods, Inc.(rm)
May 13, 2008 Filing 187 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE pursuant to the verdict rendered by the jury. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/13/08.(mss)
May 12, 2008 Filing 186 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge J. Thomas Marten: Instructions conference held on 5/12/2008. (Court Reporter Jana Hoelscher.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mss)
May 12, 2008 Filing 185 MINUTE ORDER by deputy clerk: lunch shall be provided by the clerk to the jury members during their deliberation. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/12/08.(mss)
April 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 184 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 145 Motion in Limine; granting 150 Motion in Limine; denying 155 Motion in Limine; denying 169 Motion in Limine; granting 173 Motion in Limine. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/25/08. (jw)
April 23, 2008 Filing 183 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge J. Thomas Marten: In limine conference held on 4/23/2008. (Court Reporter Jim Harper.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mss)
April 23, 2008 Filing 182 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Monsour's, Inc.. (James, Richard)
April 22, 2008 Filing 181 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Monsour's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Childs Deposition, # 2 Exhibit B Responses to Interrogatories)(James, Richard)
April 18, 2008 Filing 180 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 173 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Wachtel, John)
April 18, 2008 Filing 179 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 169 MOTION in Limine REGARDING DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LEROY KRUEGER AND EDWARD FAIRCHILD, 155 MOTION in Limine REGARDING INCREASED SALES AND PROFIT MADE BY DEFENDANT - DEF'S THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C)(Wachtel, John)
April 18, 2008 Filing 178 RESPONSE to 168 Objection(s) "DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLALINTIFF'S OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 26(a)(3) WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS" by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through E)(Wachtel, John)
April 18, 2008 Filing 177 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re: 169 MOTION in Limine REGARDING DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LEROY KRUEGER AND EDWARD FAIRCHILD, 155 MOTION in Limine REGARDING INCREASED SALES AND PROFIT MADE BY DEFENDANT - DEF'S THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE Plaintiff's Response in Opposition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 17, 2008 Filing 176 OBJECTION(S) to 162 Designation of Depositions "Defendant Menu Maker Foods, Inc.'s Objections to Plaintiff's Designations of Deposition Testimony" by Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Wachtel, John)
April 17, 2008 Filing 175 Supplemental Witness & Exhibit List by Menu Maker Foods Inc.(Wachtel, John)
April 16, 2008 Filing 174 Proposed Jury Instructions by Monsour's, Inc..(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 16, 2008 Filing 173 MOTION in Limine and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 16, 2008 Filing 172 RETURN OF SERVICE of SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE (to MIchael Wheeler for trial testimony) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
April 16, 2008 Filing 171 RETURN OF SERVICE of SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE (to Shelley Corn for trial testimony) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
April 16, 2008 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 169 MOTION in Limine REGARDING DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LEROY KRUEGER AND EDWARD FAIRCHILD by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Wachtel, John)
April 16, 2008 Filing 169 MOTION in Limine REGARDING DEPOSITION TESTIMONY OF LEROY KRUEGER AND EDWARD FAIRCHILD by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Wachtel, John)
April 15, 2008 Filing 168 OBJECTION(S) to 161 Witness & Exhibit List of Defendant by Monsour's, Inc.. (James, Richard)
April 15, 2008 Filing 167 Proposed Jury Instructions by Menu Maker Foods Inc.(Mitchell, Alexander)
April 14, 2008 Filing 166 TRANSCRIPT of portions of the motion hearing held 3/12/07 before Judge Belot, Court Reporter Janese Palmer, Telephone number 316-660-5683. Transcript purchased by: Dustin DeVaughn. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/14/2008. (cs)
April 14, 2008 Filing 165 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Menu Maker Foods Inc. Amendment to 164 Designation of Depositions. (Wachtel, John)
April 14, 2008 Filing 164 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Wachtel, John)
April 10, 2008 Filing 163 Final Witness & Exhibit List by Monsour's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(James, Richard)
April 10, 2008 Filing 162 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Monsour's, Inc.. (James, Richard)
April 10, 2008 Filing 161 Witness & Exhibit List by Menu Maker Foods Inc.(Wachtel, John)
April 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 159 joint motion of plaintiff and defendant for a two day extension to file final witness and exhibit lists and designate deposition testimony. The parties' designations are due on or before April 10, 2008. Entered by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4-9-08.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Marten, J. Thomas)
April 8, 2008 Filing 159 Joint MOTION for extension of time to File Plaintiff's and Defendant's Witness and Exhibit Lists and Designate Deposition Testimony by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc.(James, Richard)
April 8, 2008 Filing 158 NOTICE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Dennis Lutz on 04/21/2008 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 141 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/7/08. (mss)
April 1, 2008 Filing 156 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 155 MOTION in Limine REGARDING INCREASED SALES AND PROFIT MADE BY DEFENDANT - DEF'S THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Wachtel, John)
April 1, 2008 Filing 155 MOTION in Limine REGARDING INCREASED SALES AND PROFIT MADE BY DEFENDANT - DEF'S THIRD MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Wachtel, John)
March 27, 2008 Filing 154 DESIGNATION OF DEPOSITION(S) by Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Wachtel, John)
March 18, 2008 Filing 153 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE, 150 MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Letter Marshal Hull report, # 2 Excerpts of Deposition Marshal Hull deposition)(Mitchell, Alexander)
March 17, 2008 Filing 152 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 150 MOTION in Limine (Hill, Jennifer)
March 3, 2008 Filing 151 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE, 150 MOTION in Limine by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
March 3, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION in Limine by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
January 31, 2008 Filing 149 NOTICE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Jean-Pierre Emond on 02-12-2008 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
January 29, 2008 Filing 148 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Wachtel, John)
January 22, 2008 Filing 147 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE (Hill, Jennifer)
January 7, 2008 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts of Deposition of Mark Monsour taken 7/25/07)(Wachtel, John)
January 7, 2008 Filing 145 MOTION in Limine REGARDING HEARSAY TESTIMONY OF ONE MIKE SLACK, DECEASED - DEFENDANT'S FIRST MOTION IN LIMINE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Wachtel, John)
November 27, 2007 Filing 144 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Mitchell, Alexander)
November 16, 2007 Filing 143 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
October 10, 2007 Filing 142 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Asset Purchase Agreement)# 2 Exhibit B (M. Hull deposition Vol. 1)# 3 Exhibit C (M. Hull report)# 4 Exhibit D (M. Hull Supp. Report)# 5 Exhibit E (M. Hull deposition)# 6 Exhibit F (B of A letter)# 7 Exhibit G (M. Monsour deposition Vol. 1)# 8 Exhibit H (M Monsour deposition Vol. 2))(Mitchell, Alexander)
October 10, 2007 Filing 141 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
September 24, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 140 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED; estimated trial time 10 days; dispositive motion deadline 10/22/2007. In limine conference set 4/23/08 at 2:30. Jury Trial set 4/29/2008 at 9:00 AM before District Judge J. Thomas Marten. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Marten on 9/24/07.(rt)
September 20, 2007 Filing 139 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories AMENDED (James, Richard)
September 18, 2007 Filing 138 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiff's Second Supplemental Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories (James, Richard)
August 15, 2007 NOTICE OF REDACTION REQUIREMENT to attorneys re 129 Transcript,. Within 10 days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the parties intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, the transcript will be made electronically available after 10 days. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (rm, )
August 10, 2007 Filing 137 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of Supplemental Expert Report (Mitchell, Alexander)
July 18, 2007 Filing 136 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Marshal Hull and Mark Monsour on July 25, 2007 (Mitchell, Alexander)
July 13, 2007 Filing 135 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Supplemental Expert Report (DeVaughn, Dustin)
June 26, 2007 Filing 134 MINUTE ORDER amending 133 Scheduling Order: Plaintiff shall have 30 days from June 14, 2007, to supplement its expert reports. Defendant shall have 30 days after receipt of plaintiff's supplementation to supplement its expert reports. Entered by deputy clerk on 6/26/07.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mss)
June 25, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 9/21/2007. Dispositive motion deadline 10/22/2007. In limine conference set for 4/23/08 at 2:30 p.m. before District Judge J. Thomas Marten. Jury Trial set for 4/29/2008 at 9:00 a.m. before District Judge J. Thomas Marten. Estimated trial time is 10 days. SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL DEADLINES AND RULINGS ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Marten on 6/25/07.(mss)
June 14, 2007 Filing 132 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Thomas Marten: Status Conference by telephone held on 6/14/2007. (Court Reporter Jim Harper.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mss)
June 1, 2007 Filing 131 NOTICE of Hearing: Status conference by telephone set for 6/14/2007 at 4:00 p.m. with District Judge J. Thomas Marten. The court will initiate the call.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mss)
May 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 130 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 119 Motion to Enforce. Signed by Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/30/07. (rt)
May 16, 2007 Filing 129 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held 4/30/2007 before Judge Belot, Court Reporter: Cindy Schwemmer. Modified on 8/27/2007 (Sealed User Wichita rm, ).
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge J. Thomas Marten for all further proceedings. Judge Monti L Belot no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/2/07.(cs, )
April 30, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Monti L Belot : Status Conference held on 4/30/2007. No PDF Attached. (Court Reporter Cindy Schwemmer.) (cl )
April 23, 2007 Filing 127 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc.(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 23, 2007 Filing 126 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement (This is Defendant's AMENDED RESPONSE) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C)(Wachtel, John)
April 16, 2007 Filing 125 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment (James, Richard)
April 16, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Motion Hearing RE SET for 4/30/07, at 2:30 p.m. before District Judge Monti L. Belot. The clients are to appear in person for the hearing. No PDF Attached. (cl )
April 13, 2007 Filing 124 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, B, and C)(Wachtel, John)
April 4, 2007 Filing 123 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement Amended by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Appendix 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Appendix 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 4, 2007 Filing 122 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 121 Second MOTION to Continue trialSecond MOTION for Discovery by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
April 4, 2007 Filing 121 Second MOTION to Continue trial, Second MOTION for Discovery by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
April 4, 2007 NOTICE of hearing on motion to enforce Settlement Agreement. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2007 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Monti L Belot. The clients are to appear in person for the hearing.No PDF Attached.(cl )
April 3, 2007 Filing 120 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6 Exhibit # 7 Exhibit # 8 Exhibit # 9 Exhibit # 10 Exhibit # 11 Exhibit)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 3, 2007 Filing 119 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
April 3, 2007 Filing 118 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Revised Pretrial Order# 2 Exhibit Redlined Revised Pretrial Order)(Mitchell, Alexander)
April 3, 2007 Filing 117 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
March 23, 2007 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S FINAL RULE 26(a)(3) DISCLOSURES (Wachtel, John)
March 12, 2007 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Monti L Belot : denying 109 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 112 Motion to Continue; Motion Hearing held on 3/12/2007. Parties to submit a new pretrial order on or before 3/30/07. No PDF Attached. (Court Reporter Janese Palmer.) (cl )
February 22, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing regarding 109 MOTION for Reconsideration of 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 111 MOTION in Limine, and 112 MOTION to Continue TRIAL : Motion Hearing set for 3/12/2007 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Monti L Belot. No PDF attached.(jh)
February 6, 2007 Filing 115 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 111 MOTION in Limine (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Plaintiff's Motion for Costs Associated with Expert Deposition. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 2/6/2007. (Bostwick, Donald)
February 1, 2007 Filing 113 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment or for an Order Granting a Continuance and Reopening Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures)(James, Richard)
January 25, 2007 Filing 112 MOTION to Continue TRIAL by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
January 24, 2007 Filing 111 MOTION in Limine by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
January 24, 2007 Filing 110 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
January 24, 2007 Filing 109 MOTION for Reconsideration re 108 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
January 23, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing: Jury Trial set for 4/17/2007 at 09:00 AM before District Judge Monti L Belot. No PDF Attached.(cl )
January 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 86 defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 1/22/07. (cl )
January 8, 2007 Filing 107 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Mitchell, Alexander)
January 2, 2007 Filing 106 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re: 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A James Affidavit)(James, Richard)
January 2, 2007 Filing 105 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of 104 Response to Motion,, Supplement to Doc 104 by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A Supplement# 2 Exhibit Supp Ex B# 3 Exhibit Supp Ex K)(James, Richard)
December 30, 2006 Filing 104 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. re 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental as requested by the Court (Attachments: # 1 Appendix List of Exhibits# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R# 20 Exhibit S# 21 Exhibit T# 22 Exhibit U# 23 Exhibit V)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 29, 2006 Filing 103 Proposed Jury Instructions by Monsour's, Inc..(DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 18, 2006 Filing 102 RESPONSE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wachtel, John)
December 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 100 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 90 Plaintiff's MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert. Response deadline 12/21/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 12/11/2006. (Bostwick, Donald)
December 11, 2006 Filing 100 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting 98 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 90 Plaintiff's MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert. Response deadline 12/11/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 11/29/2006. (Bostwick, Donald)
November 29, 2006 Filing 98 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
November 29, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment regarding the individual claims of Mark Monsour and Sheila Monsour. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 11/29/06. (jh)
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Don Bostwick. 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert filed by Monsour's, Inc. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 11/22/06.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cl, )
November 21, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a response to plaintiffs' motion requiring defendant to pay costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs expert until 11/29/06. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 11/22/06. (cl )
November 20, 2006 Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
November 20, 2006 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Monti L Belot : Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2006. (Court Reporter Cindy Schwemmer.) No PDF Attached. (cl )
November 17, 2006 Filing 93 AFFIDAVIT of Jon R. Graves re 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc(Mitchell, Alexander)
November 13, 2006 Filing 92 Letter from Judge Monti Belot (cl )
November 10, 2006 Filing 91 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Hull Depo Cover Page# 2 Exhibit B Regier Carr Invoice# 3 Exhibit C Breitenbach Report# 4 Exhibit D Wachtel Ltr 09-12-06# 5 Exhibit E James Ltr 09-22-06# 6 Exhibit F 10-18-06 E-mail Exchanges)(James, Richard)
November 10, 2006 Filing 90 MOTION for costs associated with deposition of plaintiffs' expert by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (James, Richard)
September 15, 2006 Filing 89 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Mitchell, Alexander)
September 6, 2006 Filing 88 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. re 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
August 14, 2006 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Marshal Hull deposition# 2 Appendix Mark Monsour deposition# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Exhibit E# 8 Exhibit F# 9 Exhibit G)(Mitchell, Alexander)
August 14, 2006 Filing 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Mitchell, Alexander)
August 14, 2006 Filing 85 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Alexander B. Mitchell, II on behalf of Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Mitchell, Alexander)
July 26, 2006 Filing 84 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Marshall Hull on July 27, 2006 at 1:00 p.m. (Mitchell, Alexander)
July 11, 2006 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS MARK MONSOUR AND SHEILA MONSOUR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wachtel, John)
July 3, 2006 Filing 82 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.. Amendment to 81 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
June 29, 2006 Filing 81 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. re 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS MARK MONSOUR AND SHEILA MONSOUR (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(DeVaughn, Dustin)
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 80 AMENDED ORDER granting 75 MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/29/06 to File Response as to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 6/16/06.(jh)
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/29/06 to File Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 6/16/06. (jh)
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 76 MOTION for extension of time TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS until 8/19/06. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 6/16/06.(jh)
June 16, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 77 *** DISREGARD ENTRY ORDER TO BE RE-FILED*** ORDER granting 76 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions until 8/19/2006. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 6/16/05. (jh) Modified on 6/16/2006 (ef, ).
June 15, 2006 Filing 76 MOTION for extension of time TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
June 14, 2006 Filing 75 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS MARK MONSOUR AND SHEILA MONSOUR by Plaintiff Monsour's, Inc. (James, Richard)
May 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PRETRIAL ORDER ENTERED: Trial will be to a jury. Estimated trial time 10 days. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 5/25/06.(cl )
May 23, 2006 Filing 73 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS MARK MONSOUR AND SHEILA MONSOUR by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement# 2 Exhibit B - Excerpt of Mark Monsour Deposition# 3 Exhibit C - Non-Competition Agreement# 4 Exhibit D - Sheila Monsour's Answers to Menu Maker Foods, Inc.'s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff Sheila A. Monsour# 5 Exhibit E - Excerpts of Sheila Monsour Deposition# 6 Exhibit F - Mark Monsour's Answers to Menu Maker Foods, Inc.'s Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Mark Monsour)(Wachtel, John)
May 23, 2006 Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment ON THE CLAIMS OF THE PLAINTIFFS MARK MONSOUR AND SHEILA MONSOUR by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
May 23, 2006 Filing 71 ADR REPORT by Menu Maker Foods Inc. ADR session held on: May 10, 2006 and conducted by Dennis Gillen. Results of ADR: Case did not settle. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Discovery Complete(Wachtel, John)
April 3, 2006 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S EXPERT REPORT (Wachtel, John)
March 29, 2006 Filing 69 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc executed upon Michael Wheeler on 03/27/2006 by personal service (Wachtel, John)
March 29, 2006 Filing 68 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc executed upon Shelly Corn on 3/26/2006 by personal service (Wachtel, John)
March 28, 2006 Filing 67 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Marshal Hull on May 19, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Mitchell, Alexander)
March 21, 2006 Filing 66 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Shelly Corn on March 29, 2006 at 1:00 p.m. (Wachtel, John)
March 21, 2006 Filing 65 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Michael Wheeler on March 29, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (Wachtel, John)
March 10, 2006 Filing 64 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST INTERROGATORIES (Wachtel, John)
March 8, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures. Defendant's expert disclosures due on or before 4/3/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 3/8/2006. (Bostwick, Donald)
March 8, 2006 Filing 62 MOTION for extension of time WITHIN WHICH TO SERVE EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURES UPON PLAINTIFFS by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc (Wachtel, John)
March 8, 2006 Filing 61 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Dick Graves on March 13, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
March 8, 2006 Filing 60 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of AMENDED DEFENDANT'S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Wachtel, John)
March 8, 2006 Filing 59 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of AMENDED DEFENDANT'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Wachtel, John)
March 7, 2006 Filing 58 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Corporate Representative of Monsour's, Inc. on March 15, 2006 at 8:00 a.m. (Wachtel, John)
March 7, 2006 Filing 57 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Mark Monsour on March 15, 2006 at 8:00 a.m. (Wachtel, John)
March 6, 2006 Filing 56 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Wachtel, John)
March 3, 2006 Filing 55 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc executed upon BKD, LLP on February 27, 2006 by certified mail (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena In A Civil Case)(Wachtel, John)
March 3, 2006 Filing 54 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc executed upon Bank of America, N.A. re: Mark Monsour on February 24, 2006 by certified mail (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Subpoena In A Civil Case)(Wachtel, John)
March 2, 2006 Filing 53 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Wachtel, John)
February 17, 2006 Filing 52 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Rule 26 Expert Disclosures (James, Richard)
February 16, 2006 Filing 51 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of John Trisler on February 22, 2006 at 9:00 a.m. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 13, 2006 Filing 50 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures (DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 13, 2006 Filing 49 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Discovery Responses (DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 13, 2006 Filing 48 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Kevin F. Mitchelson on February 22, 2006 at 1:00 p.m. (Wachtel, John)
February 13, 2006 Filing 47 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of John Trisler on February 22, 2006 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 13, 2006 Filing 46 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Ken Goodwin, Ron Boss and Creighton Cox on February 20th & 21st, 2006 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
February 7, 2006 Filing 45 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT (Wachtel, John)
February 6, 2006 Filing 44 NOTICE of DOCUMENT SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO RULE 45(b)(1) by Menu Maker Foods Inc RE: Mark Monsour/Bank of America (Attachments: # 1)(Wachtel, John)
February 6, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting 41 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Expert Disclosures. Expert disclosures by Plaintiffs due on or before 2/17/2006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 2/6/2006. (Bostwick, Donald)
February 6, 2006 Filing 42 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Plaintiff Mark Monsour executed upon 02/03/06 on 01/26/06 by Certified Mail (James, Richard)
February 3, 2006 Filing 41 MOTION for extension of time to Designate Experts by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.(James, Richard)
February 1, 2006 Filing 40 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc executed upon Bank of America, N.A. on 01/23/06 by Certified Mail (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena In A Civil Case (to Bank of America))(Wachtel, John)
January 17, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER sustaining 30 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice Counts V and VI. Signed by Judge Monti L Belot on 1/18/06. (cl )
January 17, 2006 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Responses to Defendant's Second and Third Requests for Production (James, Richard)
January 17, 2006 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents to Defendant (James, Richard)
January 13, 2006 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' First Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosure (DeVaughn, Dustin)
January 6, 2006 Filing 35 NOTICE of DOCUMENT SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO RULE 45(b)(1) by Menu Maker Foods Inc (Attachments: # 1)(Wachtel, John)
December 20, 2005 Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT MENU MAKER FOODS, INC.'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS (Wachtel, John)
December 19, 2005 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF MONSOUR'S, INC. (Wachtel, John)
December 13, 2005 Filing 32 NOTICE by Defendant Menu Maker Foods Inc of taking deposition of Sheila Monsour on December 20, 2005 (Wachtel, John)
December 12, 2005 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 30 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Counts V and VI by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.(James, Richard)
December 12, 2005 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Counts V and VI by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.(DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 9, 2005 Filing 29 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DISCOVERY RESPONSES (Wachtel, John)
December 8, 2005 Filing 28 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Leroy Krueger` on 12/15/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 8, 2005 Filing 27 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Ed Fairchild on 12/14/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 8, 2005 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Ron Orr on 12/13/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 8, 2005 Filing 25 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Melvin Childs on 12/14/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 8, 2005 Filing 24 AMENDED NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Gene Fields on 12/13/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 6, 2005 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Responses to Discovery (DeVaughn, Dustin)
December 1, 2005 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DISCOVERY REQUESTS (Wachtel, John)
November 29, 2005 Filing 21 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Ron Orr on 12/13/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
November 29, 2005 Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Melvin Childs on 12/14/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
November 29, 2005 Filing 19 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Gene Fields on 12/13/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
November 29, 2005 Filing 18 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Ed Fairchild on 12/14/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
November 29, 2005 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of taking deposition of Leroy Krueger on 12/15/05 (DeVaughn, Dustin)
November 8, 2005 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Request for Production of Documents and First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant (DeVaughn, Dustin)
October 27, 2005 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Eastman on behalf of Menu Maker Foods Inc (Eastman, Jeffrey)
October 20, 2005 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DISCOVERY REQUESTS (Wachtel, John)
October 19, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 4/28/2006. Dispositive motion deadline set for 6/19/2006. Mediation deadline 1/31/2006. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/15/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/22/2006 at 01:30 PM before District Judge Monti L Belot.See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 10/19/05. (aw )
October 19, 2005 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick : Scheduling Conference held on 10/19/2005 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aw)
October 18, 2005 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (Wachtel, John)
October 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 10/11/2005. (Bostwick, Donald)
October 6, 2005 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (James, Richard)
September 28, 2005 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Menu Maker Foods Inc of RULE 26(A)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF DEFENDANT (Wachtel, John)
September 15, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/19/2005 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Donald W. Bostwick. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/14/2005. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 9/15/05. (aw )
September 1, 2005 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Menu Maker Foods Inc.(Wachtel, John)
August 24, 2005 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Menu Maker Foods Inc identifying none as corporate parent. (Wachtel, John)
August 24, 2005 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John V. Wachtel on behalf of Menu Maker Foods Inc. (Wachtel, John)
August 15, 2005 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons filed by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. (DeVaughn, Dustin)
August 1, 2005 Summons Issued as to Menu Maker Foods Inc. (rm, )
June 30, 2005 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.. (rm, )
June 30, 2005 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (rm, )
June 30, 2005 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Summons Issued with trial location of Wichita, filed by Mark Monsour, Sheila Monsour, Monsour's, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(rm, )
June 30, 2005 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 250, receipt number 027561 (rm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monsour et al v. Menu Maker Foods Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monsour's, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menu Maker Foods Inc
Represented By: John V. Wachtel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?