Keeler v. Aramark
Plaintiff: Quincey Gerald Keeler and Jerry
Defendant: Aramark
Consolidated Defendant: Larry Gengler
Case Number: 6:2008cv01168
Filed: June 2, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Monti L Belot
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2012 Filing 185 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: affirming decision of the District Court. Affirmed; Terminated on the merits after submissions without oral hearing; Written, signed, unpublished;. Judges Tymkovich, Baldock, authoring, and Gorsuch. (Appeal No. 11-3320) (Attachments: #1 Mandate issued letter)(aa)
November 2, 2011 Filing 184 RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA electronically and by conventional mailing, Volumes 8, re #180 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 11-3320). (aa)
October 28, 2011 Filing 182 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Marcos A. Barbosa on behalf of Aramark and Larry Gengler. (Barbosa, Marcos) Modified on 10/31/2011 to add parties represented (aa).
October 27, 2011 Filing 183 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on 10/27/2011 and assigned Appeal No. 11-3320 re #180 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler. Notice of appearance due on 11/10/2011 for Aramark and Larry Gengler. Notice of appearance due on 11/28/2011 for Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
October 26, 2011 Filing 181 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #180 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet)(aa)
October 26, 2011 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #179 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #174 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike, #175 Judgment by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
October 26, 2011 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee waived re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #180 on behalf of Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION) (aa)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER denying #177 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 9/28/2011. Mailed to pro se party Quincey Gerald Keeler by regular mail. (aa)
August 31, 2011 Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #177 MOTION for Reconsideration re #174 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, (Barbosa, Marcos)
August 25, 2011 Filing 177 MOTION for Reconsideration re #174 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
August 22, 2011 Filing 176 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #174 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion to Strike and #175 Judgment; addressed to Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
August 12, 2011 Filing 175 JUDGMENT. Signed by deputy clerk on 8/12/2011. Mailed to pro se party Quincey Gerald Keeler by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70110110000213990892. (aa)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #118 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating #157 Motion to Strike ; denying #166 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 8/11/2011.Mailed to pro se party Quincey Gerald Keeler by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number: 70110110000213990892. (aa)
August 11, 2011 Filing 173 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Jarod G. Goff as to Aramark, Larry Gengler (Goff, Jarod)
May 23, 2011 Filing 172 REPLY to #167 Supplement to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #157 MOTION to Strike. (aa)
May 23, 2011 Filing 171 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(aa)
May 9, 2011 Filing 170 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler in ARAMARK Healthcare Support Servies, LLC's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Goff, Jarod)
May 9, 2011 Filing 169 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #166 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 PART 1 OF 4, #7 Exhibit 5 PART 2 OF 4, #8 Exhibit 5 PART 3 OF 4, #9 Exhibit 5 PART 4 OF 4, #10 Exhibit 6 PART 1 OF 4, #11 Exhibit 6 PART 2 OF 4, #12 Exhibit 6 PART 3 OF 4, #13 Exhibit 6 PART 4 OF 4, #14 Exhibit 7 PART 1 OF 4, #15 Exhibit 7 PART 2 OF 4, #16 Exhibit 7 PART 3 OF 4, #17 Exhibit 7 PART 4 OF 4, #18 Exhibit 8, #19 Exhibit 9, #20 Exhibit 10, #21 Exhibit 11, #22 Exhibit 12, #23 Exhibit 13, #24 Exhibit 14, #25 Exhibit 15, #26 Exhibit 16)(Goff, Jarod)
May 9, 2011 Filing 168 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler to ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Supplement to Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition. (Goff, Jarod)
May 9, 2011 Filing 167 SUPPLEMENT to #161 Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition by Defendant Aramark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Goff, Jarod) Modified on 5/10/2011 to add docket entry relationship (aa).
April 18, 2011 Filing 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
April 4, 2011 Filing 165 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #157 MOTION to Strike. (aa)
March 21, 2011 Filing 164 REPLY to Response to Motion by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re: #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Defendant Larry Gengler's Joinder in ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Goff, Jarod)
March 21, 2011 Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Defendant ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Goff, Jarod)
March 21, 2011 Filing 162 RESPONSE by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #157 MOTION to Strike (Defendant Larry Gengler's Joinder in Defendant ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition) (Goff, Jarod)
March 21, 2011 Filing 161 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #157 MOTION to Strike (Defendant ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Deposition) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Goff, Jarod)
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Joinder. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 3/17/2011. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rm)
March 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER granting #132 Motion to Extend Deadline for Summary Judgment (Dispositive motion deadline extended for Plaintiff until 4/18/2011); finding as moot #132 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 3/16/2011. Mailed to pro se party Quincey Keeler by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
March 7, 2011 Filing 158 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T)(Plaintiff also included two copies of audio tapes to be used as exhibits to this Response. They will be kept on file in the Clerk's Office.) (adw) Modified to add text on audio exhibit on 3/8/2011 (adw).
March 7, 2011 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike Deposition by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(adw)
February 17, 2011 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #155 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, mailed to plaintiff at P.O. Box 49481, Wichita, KS 67201 on 2/17/2011 by regular mail. (aw)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #149 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Response deadline 3/7/2011. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 2/16/2011.Mailed to pro se party by regular mail (rm)
February 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #148 Plaintiff's "Motion for Default Judgment (Sanctions)." Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/16/2011. Mailed to pro se party Quincey Keeler by regular mail. (df) Modified on 2/17/2011 to correct typo (aa).
November 29, 2010 Filing 154 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #148 MOTION for Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aa)
November 15, 2010 Filing 153 RESPONSE by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #148 MOTION for Default Judgment (in opposition) on Claims 15, 16, and 17 (Goff, Jarod)
November 15, 2010 Filing 152 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #148 MOTION for Default Judgment (in opposition) on Claims 15, 16, and 17 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Goff, Jarod)
November 5, 2010 Filing 151 RESPONSE by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
November 5, 2010 Filing 150 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
November 2, 2010 Filing 149 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
November 1, 2010 Filing 148 MOTION for Default Judgment (Sanctions) on Claims 15, 16, 17 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(aa)
October 19, 2010 Filing 147 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Larry Gengler of Defendant Larry Gengler's Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories (Goff, Jarod)
October 19, 2010 Filing 146 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark of Defendant ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, Inc.'s Supplemental Responses to Plaintiffs' Interrogatories (Goff, Jarod)
October 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #144 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint Response deadline 11/16/2010. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 10/18/10.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rm)
October 18, 2010 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 145 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, mailed to Quincey Gerald Keeler, P.O. Box 49481, Wichita, KS 67201 on 10/18/2010 by regular mail. (rm)
October 13, 2010 Filing 144 SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
September 30, 2010 Filing 143 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Larry Gengler of Defendant Larry Gengler's Additional Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Goff, Jarod)
September 30, 2010 Filing 142 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark of ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services, LLC's Additional Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories (Goff, Jarod)
September 9, 2010 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #141 Order on Motion to Compel, mailed on 9/9/2010 to pro se party, First Class Mail regular delivery. (aw)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #137 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, Motion for Extension to Respond to Summary Judgment. Defendant shall provide the required discovery responses on or before September 30, 2010, and Plaintiff shall file his response to summary judgment on or before October 14, 2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 09/08/10. (df)
August 13, 2010 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #137 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (aa)
August 2, 2010 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 08/02/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aa)
July 30, 2010 Filing 139 RESPONSE by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #137 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Joinder to Defendant ARAMARK HSS'S Response (Goff, Jarod)
July 30, 2010 Filing 138 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #132 MOTION for extension of time MOTION to Continue discovery deadline, #137 MOTION to Compel MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
July 19, 2010 Filing 137 MOTION to Compel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint ( Response deadline 8/2/2010) by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
July 8, 2010 Filing 136 RESPONSE by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #132 MOTION for extension of time MOTION to Continue discovery deadline (Joinder) (Goff, Jarod)
July 8, 2010 Filing 135 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #132 MOTION for extension of time MOTION to Continue discovery deadline (Goff, Jarod)
July 7, 2010 Filing 134 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Larry Gengler of Defendant Larry Gengler's Joinder to Defendant ARAMARK HSS's Objections to Plaintiff's Second Discovery Requests (Goff, Jarod)
July 7, 2010 Filing 133 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark of ARAMARK HSS's Objections to Plaintiff's Second Discovery Requests (Goff, Jarod)
July 6, 2010 Filing 132 MOTION for extension of time to file Motion for Summary Judgment, MOTION to Continue discovery deadline ( Response deadline 7/20/2010) by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
June 30, 2010 Filing 131 MOTION for Joinder to Defendant ARAMARK Healthcare Support Services LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment and Brief in Support Thereof by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 130 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13, #7 Exhibit 14, #8 Exhibit 15, #9 Exhibit 16)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 129 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, Part 3)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 128 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, Part 2)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 127 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7, Part 1)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 126 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Part 3)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 125 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Part 2)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 124 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, Part 1)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 123 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Part 3)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 122 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Part 2)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 121 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 - Part 1)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 120 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #119 Memorandum in Support of Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 119 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
June 30, 2010 Filing 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #94 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve More than 25 Requests for Admission; denying #100 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash; denying #101 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying #103 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying #104 Plaintiff's Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part #108 Defendant's Motion to Unseal Document, retaining #2 Plaintiff's IFP filing under seal but granting Defendant electronic access to such document. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 6/24/2010. (Bostwick, Donald)
June 22, 2010 Filing 116 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Larry Gengler of Larry Gengler's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions (Goff, Jarod)
June 22, 2010 Filing 115 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark of ARAMARK HSS's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents, and Request for Admissions (Goff, Jarod)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER denying #89 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 6/16/10. (rm)
June 9, 2010 Filing 113 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #108 MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler (Goff, Jarod)
May 26, 2010 Filing 112 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of discovery by Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
May 26, 2010 Filing 111 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #108 MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
May 26, 2010 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #100 MOTION to Quash, #101 MOTION for Sanctions, #104 MOTION to Quash, #103 MOTION for Sanctions. (aa)
May 14, 2010 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #108 MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
May 14, 2010 Filing 108 MOTION to Unseal Document #2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
May 14, 2010 Filing 107 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler to Defendant Aramark HSS's Response to Plaintiff's Motions to Quash Subpoena and Motions for Sanctions. (Goff, Jarod)
May 14, 2010 Filing 106 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #100 MOTION to Quash, #101 MOTION for Sanctions, #104 MOTION to Quash, #103 MOTION for Sanctions (Goff, Jarod)
May 14, 2010 Filing 105 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(e) Disclosures by Aramark. (Goff, Jarod)
May 7, 2010 Filing 104 MOTION to Quash 2nd Subpoena by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
May 7, 2010 Filing 103 MOTION for Sanctions for 2nd Subpoena by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler(aa)
May 5, 2010 Filing 102 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Aramark executed upon Steven Heeney on 4/29/2010 by Personal Service (Kreamer, James)
April 30, 2010 Filing 101 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
April 30, 2010 Filing 100 MOTION to Quash by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
April 22, 2010 Filing 99 RETURN OF SERVICE of subpoena(s) filed by Defendant Aramark executed upon Randy Kaufman on April 12, 2010 by Personal Service (Kreamer, James)
April 16, 2010 Filing 98 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler TO DEFENDANT ARAMARK HSS's RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION: FOR LEAVE TO BE ALLOWED TO HAVE MORE REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION THAN 25. (Goff, Jarod)
April 16, 2010 Filing 97 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #94 MOTION for Leave to Be Allowed to Have More Requests for Admission Than 25 (Goff, Jarod)
April 16, 2010 Filing 96 (DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - DOCUMENT WAS FILED INCORRECTLY - Counsel will refile using the correct event.) --- MOTION for Leave to file more requests for admission than 25 by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod) Modified on 4/16/2010 to add disregard text (aa).
April 2, 2010 Filing 95 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Quincey Gerald Keeler of discovery. (aa)
April 2, 2010 Filing 94 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO BE ALLOWED TO HAVE MORE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS THAN 25 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery deadline 6/23/2010. Dispositive motion deadline 7/9/2010. See attached Order for additional deadlines and details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 3/24/10.(aw)
March 24, 2010 Filing 92 NOTICE by Defendant Aramark of taking deposition of Quincy Gerald Keeler on March 31, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. (Goff, Jarod)
March 24, 2010 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Aramark of Defendant's Rule 26(a) Disclosures (Goff, Jarod)
March 23, 2010 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/23/2010. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
February 18, 2010 Filing 90 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aramark identifying ARAMARK Corporation as corporate parent. (Goff, Jarod)
February 17, 2010 Filing 89 MOTION for Reconsideration re #86 Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
February 16, 2010 Filing 88 NOTICE titled, "Motion: Asking Courts On Ruling In Case On Claims 7, 12, 25-28 And Motion For Reconsideration (and other)" by Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa) Modified on 2/17/2010 to correct docket type (aa).
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/23/2010 at 02:30 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 3/18/2010. See attached Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 2/11/10.(aw)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re #76 Response to Order filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler. The clerk is directed not to serve any summonses ; finding as moot #79 Motion for Reconsideration ; finding as moot #78 Motion for Reconsideration Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 1/11/10. (rm)
December 31, 2009 Filing 85 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO NOTICE COURT ON PAGES 5 AND 6 OF THE PLAINTIFF'S FILED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT DATED JULY 17,2009 by Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
December 31, 2009 Filing 84 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #79 MOTION for Reconsideration & #78 MOTION for Reconsideration. (aa)
December 17, 2009 Filing 83 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #82 Response to Motion,. (Goff, Jarod)
December 17, 2009 Filing 82 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #79 MOTION for Reconsideration re #75 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion for Sanctions & Response re #78 MOTION for Reconsideration re #75 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Joinder, Order on Motion for Sanctions (Goff, Jarod) Modified on 12/18/2009 to clarify text (aa).
December 17, 2009 Filing 81 ANSWER to Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Larry Gengler.(Goff, Jarod)
December 17, 2009 Filing 80 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint by Aramark.(Goff, Jarod)
December 7, 2009 Filing 79 PLAINTIFF MOTION TO RECONSIDER CLAIMS 25-28 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (aa)
December 7, 2009 Filing 78 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER CLAIM 12 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #75 Order. (aa)
December 7, 2009 Filing 77 PLAINTIFF's EXPLANATION IN DEFINITE STATEMENT FOR CLAIM 7 (6) by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
December 7, 2009 Filing 76 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Titled, "PLAINTIFF'S CAUSE TO NOT SERVICE DEFENDANTS." (aa) Modified on 12/8/2009 to change title (aa).
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot #40 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting in part and denying in part #44 Motion to Dismiss; granting #60 Motion to Strike ; granting #61 Motion for Joinder; denying #63 Motion for Sanctions. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 11/24/09. (rm)
November 18, 2009 Filing 74 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #65 MOTION to Strike. This is also a Surreply to #60 MOTION to Strike. (aa)
November 18, 2009 Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #63 MOTION for Sanctions. (aa)
November 9, 2009 Filing 72 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #70 Response to Motion,,. (Goff, Jarod)
November 9, 2009 Filing 71 DISREGARD THIS ENTRY - DOCUMENT WAS FILED INCORRECTLY AND IS ACTUALLY A COPY OF DE #70 . This entry was originally filed as: JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #70 Response to Motion. (Goff, Jarod) Modified on 11/10/2009 to add disregard text (aa).
November 9, 2009 Filing 70 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #65 MOTION to Strike #60 MOTION to Strike #57 Surreply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (Goff, Jarod) Modified on 11/18/2009 to clarify text (aa).
November 9, 2009 Filing 69 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #68 Reply to Response to Motion,,. (Goff, Jarod)
November 9, 2009 Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #60 MOTION to Strike #57 Surreply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Goff, Jarod) Modified on 11/18/2009 to clarify text (aa).
November 4, 2009 Filing 67 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #66 Response to Motion for Sanctions filed by Plaintiff. (Goff, Jarod)
November 4, 2009 Filing 66 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #63 MOTION for Sanctions (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Copy of Manila Envelope, #2 Exhibit B - Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit C - Certified Mail Receipt)(Goff, Jarod)
October 27, 2009 Filing 65 MOTION to Strike #60 MOTION to Strike #57 Surreply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
October 27, 2009 Filing 64 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #60 MOTION to Strike #57 Surreply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint.(aa)
October 27, 2009 Filing 63 MOTION for Sanctions by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(aa)
October 13, 2009 Filing 62 SURREPLY by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint.(aa)
September 22, 2009 Filing 61 MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Aramark HSS's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Surreplies to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement, and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler(Goff, Jarod)
September 22, 2009 Filing 60 MOTION to Strike #57 Surreply, to Plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider, to Defendant's Motion for a More Definite Statement and to Defendant's Motion to Strike Pages Five and Six of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
September 17, 2009 Filing 59 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #58 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Goff, Jarod)
September 17, 2009 Filing 58 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
September 15, 2009 Filing 57 SURREPLY by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. Also, Plaintiffs Reply to Larry Gengler's As Joinder In Issue. (aa)
September 2, 2009 Filing 56 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #53 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Goff, Jarod)
September 2, 2009 Filing 55 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #52 MOTION to Strike #48 Reply to Response to Motion. (Goff, Jarod)
September 2, 2009 Filing 54 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #51 Reply to Response to Motion,. (Goff, Jarod)
September 2, 2009 Filing 53 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
September 2, 2009 Filing 52 MOTION to Strike #48 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
September 2, 2009 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
August 24, 2009 Filing 50 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (aa)
August 19, 2009 Filing 49 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Additional response attached to #47 Response to Motion, filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler. (aa)
August 19, 2009 Filing 48 REPLY to RESPONSE to Motion by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re: #40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Order. (aa)
August 19, 2009 Filing 47 PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (aa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2009: #1 Additional response) (aa).
August 3, 2009 Filing 46 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint. (Goff, Jarod)
July 31, 2009 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
July 31, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint or in the Alternative, Motion for A More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
July 30, 2009 Filing 43 JOINDER by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler re #42 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Reconsider. (Goff, Jarod)
July 30, 2009 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Defendant Aramark re #40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Order (Goff, Jarod)
July 17, 2009 Filing 41 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aramark filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler.(cs) Modified on 1/4/2010 to change event title (aa).
July 16, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION for Reconsideration re #39 Order by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler(cs)
June 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM and ORDER. Plaintiff's complaint is stricken. Plaintiff must file an amended complaint that complies with Rule 8(a) by July 17, 2009.. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 6/22/09.(rm)
June 19, 2009 Filing 38 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE by attorney Alexandra R. Rosenblatt as to all defendants (Goff, Jarod)
June 19, 2009 Filing 37 RETURN E-mail received addressed to Alexandra R. Rosenblatt. Law firm advised attorney is no longer with firm. Local counsel is directed to withdraw attorney from case. Noticing in case turned off and document not remailed. (This is a text only entry) (lak)
June 18, 2009 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Aramark re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
May 28, 2009 Filing 35 SUPPLEMENT to #34 Response to Motion to dismiss plaintiff's amended complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler. (cs)
May 26, 2009 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (cs)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Response deadline 5/26/2009. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 4/21/09.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (rm)
April 17, 2009 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler(cs)
April 13, 2009 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
April 13, 2009 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Consol Defendant Larry Gengler(Goff, Jarod)
April 13, 2009 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
March 27, 2009 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick: Settlement Conference held on 3/27/2009. The case did not settle. Set/Reset Deadlines: Answers or other responsive pleadings or motions by current defendants to #25 Amended Complaint are due as follows: Aramark 4/13/2009; Larry Gengler 4/13/2009. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Bostwick, Donald)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER concerning Settlement Conference Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 3/20/2009.(Bostwick, Donald)
March 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE AND ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/27/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 406 DWB)before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick. The Settlement Conference will be limited to Plaintiff's claims against defendant Aramark and any Aramark employee or former employee named in the original consolidated cases or in #25 Amended Complaint. The date for answers to #25 Amended Complaint which was set for 4/3/2009 for those defendants named in the intial consolidated cases is hereby CANCELED and will be re-set after the Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 3/20/2009.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(Bostwick, Donald)
March 16, 2009 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Aramark, filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler. (Attachments: #1 Part 2, #2 Part 3, #3 Part 4)(cs)
March 11, 2009 Filing 24 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by James S. Kreamer on behalf of Aramark. (Kreamer, James)
March 10, 2009 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2009 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick. The conference will be by telephone and the Court will initiate the call. The parties will not be required to submit a Rule 26(f) planning report for this conference. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(aw)
March 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint. Defendant does not object to a proposed amendment to add FMLA claims. This case has now been consolidated with Case No. 08-1187 and both cases assigned to Judge Belot. Therefore, Plaintiff is allowed to file an Amended Complaint in this consolidated case (and no filing shall be made in Case No. 08-1187). The Amended Complaint shall be filed on or before 3/16/2009. The presently named Defendants are hereby given until 4/3/2009 to answer or otherwise plead to the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is hereby directed to provide the Clerk of the Court with the names and addresses of any newly-named defendants, and Plaintiff shall obtain the issuance of summons on any newly-named Defendants forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 3/4/2009.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Bostwick, Donald)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Consolidating Cases. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/27/09.(alm)
February 23, 2009 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Complaint Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/or File Third Suit (Goff, Jarod) Modified on 2/23/2009 to correct typo (cs).
February 23, 2009 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding Response to Motion #20 - text corrected to read: "RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint re 1 Complaint Defendant's Response To Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/or File Third Suit" (cs)
February 13, 2009 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Aramark.(Goff, Jarod)
February 9, 2009 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint or file third suit re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler(cs)
January 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Aramark answer due 2/13/2009. ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 1/27/2009. (Bostwick, Donald)
October 7, 2008 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Defendant Aramark re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (Goff, Jarod)
October 3, 2008 Filing 15 DISREGARD ENTRY - DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOCUMENT 14; MOTION to Consolidate Cases 08-1168 and 08-1187 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler (THIS PDF IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #14 ; DOCUMENT WAS BOTH A RESPONSE AND A MOTION)(cs) Modified on 10/16/2008 (cs).
October 3, 2008 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File response as to #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler(cs)
August 29, 2008 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mary P. Birk for Aramark. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 8/29/2008.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Bostwick, Donald)
August 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexandra R. Rosenblatt for Aramark. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 8/29/2008.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Bostwick, Donald)
August 28, 2008 Filing 10 Electronic Filing Registration Form of Mary Birk re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #8 by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 28, 2008 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Mary Price Birk re #8 MOTION for attorney Mary Price Birk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001280083.) by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 28, 2008 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Mary Price Birk to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001280083.) by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 28, 2008 Filing 7 Electronic Filing Registration Form of Alexandra R. Rosenblatt re motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #5 by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler, Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 28, 2008 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Alexandra R. Rosenblatt re #5 MOTION for attorney 1 to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001280075.) by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 28, 2008 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney 1 to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 10830000000001280075.) by Defendant Aramark(Goff, Jarod)
August 22, 2008 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- Personal by Quincey Gerald Keeler upon Aramark served on 8/13/2008, answer due 9/2/2008. (rm)
August 13, 2008 Summons Issued as to Aramark. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (alm)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donald W. Bostwick on 8/11/2008. (Bostwick, Donald)
June 2, 2008 Filing 2 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Quincey Gerald Keeler.(alm)
June 2, 2008 Filing 1 STRICKEN PER 6/22/09 ORDER - COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Wichita, filed by Quincey Gerald Keeler.(alm) Modified on 6/22/2009 (rm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keeler v. Aramark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincey Gerald Keeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Larry Gengler
Represented By: Mary P. Birk
Represented By: Jarod G. Goff
Represented By: Alexandra R. Rosenblatt
Represented By: Marcos A. Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark
Represented By: Mary P. Birk
Represented By: Jarod G. Goff
Represented By: Alexandra R. Rosenblatt
Represented By: James Scott Kreamer
Represented By: Marcos A. Barbosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?