April 10, 2015 |
Filing
602
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 593 Motion for Order. The court sets the supersedeas bond amount at $27,789,343.75. The judgment against Illinois Union is hereby (1) stayed temporarily until the expiration of 15 days after this order or the pos ting of the supersedeas bond by Illinois Union, whichever occurs first, and then(2) further stayed pending the outcome of Illinois Union Insurance Company's appeal to the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals, provided the bond is posted. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 4/10/2015. (smg)
|
November 5, 2014 |
Filing
518
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 372 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 378 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 385 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 459 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 496 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 510 Motion in Limine. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 11/5/2014. (smg)
|
September 17, 2012 |
Filing
412
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 370 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 372 Motion in Limine; granting 375 Motion in Limine; granting 376 Motion in Limine; denying 377 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 378 Motion in Limin e; denying 379 Motion in Limine; denying 380 Motion in Limine; denying 381 Motion in Limine; denying 382 Motion in Limine; denying 383 Motion in Limine; denying 384 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 385 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 407 Motion to Strike. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 9/17/2012. (alm)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing
397
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 359 National Union Fire Insurance Company's Renewed Motion to Compel Becht Report and Other Documents Relating to James Berry. The documents shall be produced by September 7, 2012. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 8/27/2012. (sj)
|
July 19, 2012 |
Filing
358
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 355 Motion for Order; denying 356 Motion for Order. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 7/18/2012. (alm)
|
April 26, 2012 |
Filing
349
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 336 National Union's Motion to Compel; denying 346 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 4/26/2012. (sj)
|
February 23, 2012 |
Filing
343
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 325 Motion by Illinois Union Insurance Company to Strike, in Part, the Affidavit of Sam McCormick. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 2/23/2012. (sj)
|
October 25, 2010 |
Filing
311
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 300 Motion to Clarify; denying 303 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 305 Motion to Certify; denying 305 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 10/25/2010. (aa)
|
April 28, 2010 |
Filing
299
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 141 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 04/27/2010. See order for details. (aa)
|
September 16, 2009 |
Filing
273
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 205 National Union's Motion to Disqualify Counsel; granting 207 Coffeyville's Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice 218 National Union's Motion for Leave to Depose James Berry; conditionally gra nting 225 National Union's Motion to Strike; granting 242 National Union's unopposed Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting in part and denying in part 244 Coffeyville's Motion to Compel; denying 246 Coffeyville's Motion to Quash; and granting 258 Coffeyville's Motion for Leave to File Surreply. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 9/16/09. (sj)
|
September 4, 2009 |
Filing
272
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant National Unions Motion to Strike Affidavit of Edmund S. Gross 123 and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Reply Brief 171 are DENIED as moot. National Unions alternative request for leave to file a Sur-reply brief is GRAN TED; any such brief shall be filed by September 24, 2009. National Unions Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Response 253 and its Objection to the Magistrate Judges Order of Mar. 24, 2009 231 are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Wesley E. Brown on 09/04/2009. (aa)
|
April 7, 2009 |
Filing
233
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 193 Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh's Motion to Compel. Plaintiff shall provide more complete responses on or before 4/20/2009. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 4/7/09. (sj)
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing
221
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 94 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 104 National Union Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Compel; and granting 174 National Union Fire Insurance Company's Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The deadline for completion of fact discovery is extended to 4/15/2009. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys on 3/24/09. (sj)
|