Anstine & Musgrove, Inc. et al v. Calcasieu Refining Company
Plaintiff: KLM Exploration Company, Inc., Great Plains Energy, Inc., Oil Company of America, Inc., White Exploration, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Davis Petroleum, Inc., Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Three-D Resources, Inc., Jack Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, GRA EX, LLC, Randon Production Company, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, CMX, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Dunne Equities, Inc., Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, Daystar Petroleum, Inc., H I, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, L & J Oil Properties, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Viking Resources, Inc., Calvin Noah, Drillers & Producers, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, Vess Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Ritchie Exploration, Inc., J & D Investments, LLC, Red Oak Energy, Inc., Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Seeker, LLC, Veenker Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, Musgrove Energy, Inc., Rama Operating Company, Inc., D.E. Exploration, Inc., Molitor Oil, Inc. and DK Operating, Inc.
Defendant: Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Cimmarron Transportation, LLC, Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, Crude Marketing & Transportation, Inc., Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., CIMA Energy Ltd., Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC, Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Calcasieu Refining Company, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Shell Trading (US) Company, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC and Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Case Number: 6:2010cv01173
Filed: May 28, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Pratt
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2010 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Case opened in the District of Delaware 1:10-cv-00817 (mm)
September 8, 2010 ***Civil Case Terminated. See #59 Memorandum and Order transferring case to the US District Court, District of Delaware. A copy of #59 mailed to USDC Delaware. (mg)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying plaintiffs' #37 Motion to Remand; granting defendants' #25 and #27 Motions to Transfer Case, and the case is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Delaware. Further, plaintiffs #46 Motion to Stay Consideration of the Transfer Motions is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/08/2010. (mg)
August 17, 2010 Filing 58 SUR-SURREPLY by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation re: #37 MOTION to Remand. (Griffin, W.)
July 30, 2010 Filing 57 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation re: #46 MOTION to Stay Case re #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case, #37 MOTION to Remand. (Griffin, W.) (Duplicate text removed on 8/19/2010. (mg))
July 27, 2010 Filing 56 SURREPLY by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC re: #37 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - "Arrow" Order)(Dersch, Veronica)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #53 Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a surreply in further support of their motion to remand. Defendants shall have until 7/29/2010 to file their sur-reply and plaintiffs, as the moving party, shall have until 8/17/2010 to file a sur-surreply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/27/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ses)
July 23, 2010 Filing 54 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #53 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply by Defendants Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron Products Company, Cimmarron Gathering, Delek Refining, Enterprise Crude GP, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, and by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Proposed Surreply, #2 Exhibit 2-"Arrow" Corrected Order)(Dersch, Veronica)
July 23, 2010 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to file Surreply by Defendants Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron Products Company, Cimmarron Gathering, Delek Refining, Enterprise Crude GP, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventury Refining & Transmission, and by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company. (Dersch, Veronica)
July 16, 2010 Filing 52 RESPONSE by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC re #46 MOTION to Stay Case re #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case, MOTION to Remand. (Dersch, Veronica) (Duplicate text removed on 7/16/2010. (mg))
July 9, 2010 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation re: #37 MOTION to Remand. (Griffin, W.)
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 , #48 , and #49 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Eric N. Macey, Christopher S. Moore, and Courtney D. Tedrowe are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 07/07/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
July 6, 2010 Filing 49 MOTION for attorney Courtney D. Tedrowe to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1793363.) by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Martin, Coy)
July 6, 2010 Filing 48 MOTION for attorney Christopher S. Moore to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1793352.) by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Martin, Coy)
July 6, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION for attorney Eric N. Macey to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1793331.) by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Martin, Coy)
July 2, 2010 Filing 46 MOTION to Stay Case re #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case, #41 Reply to Response to Motion, #26 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation. (Griffin, W.)
July 2, 2010 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC re #37 MOTION to Remand. (Dersch, Veronica)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney Mark Banner. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/1/10.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lak)
July 1, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for attorney Mark Banner to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1790868.) by Defendant Cimmarron Gathering, LP. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Crotty, Douglas)
June 25, 2010 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP re: #27 MOTION to Transfer or Stay and JOINDER to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motions to Transfer or Stay Case and Brief in Support. (Martin, Coy)
June 25, 2010 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC re: #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case. (Dersch, Veronica)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Robert S. Patterson, Sr. is granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Delek Refining Ltd. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/21/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
June 21, 2010 Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Robert Shepherd Patterson, Sr. to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1781965.) by Defendant Delek Refining Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ex A-Patterson Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form B-Patterson ECF Form, #3 Proposed Order)(Dersch, Veronica)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #24 unopposed motion for extension of time for defendants to answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' petition. Within 30 days of the court's order on the pending motions to transfer or stay this action (see docs. 25 and 27), if the motions are denied and the case proceeds in this district, defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiffs' petition. The court recognizes that not all defendants named in plaintiffs' petition have been served with a summons or copy of the petition. This order shall apply to all defendants who have been served with a summons and a copy of the petition prior to the entry of an order on the pending motions to transfer or stay. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
June 18, 2010 Filing 37 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Griffin, W.)
June 18, 2010 Filing 36 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation re #27 MOTION to Transfer or Stay, #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Griffin, W.)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #33 and #34 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Peter S. Goodman and Kyle A. Lonergan are granted leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of plaintiffs. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/forms/index.php. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/11/2010.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mg)
June 11, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION for attorney Kyle A. Lonergan to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1774820.) by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Affidavit of K. Lonergan, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Griffin, W.)
June 11, 2010 Filing 33 MOTION for attorney Peter S. Goodman to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number 1083-1774804.) by Plaintiffs Anstine & Musgrove, Inc., Blake Exploration, LLC, CMX, Inc., Central Operating, Inc., Clark Exploration Company, Coral Coast Petroleum, LC, D.E. Exploration, Inc., DK Operating, Inc., Davis Petroleum, Inc., Daystar Petroleum, Inc., Double Eagle Exploration, Inc., Drillers & Producers, Inc., Dunne Equities, Inc., GRA EX, LLC, Great Plains Energy, Inc., H I, Inc., Herman L. Loeb, LLC, Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC, J & D Investments, LLC, Jack Exploration, Inc., KLM Exploration Company, Inc., L & J Oil Properties, Inc., LD Drilling, Inc., Landmark Resources, Inc., McCoy Petroleum Corporation, McGinness Oil Company of Kansas, Mid-Continent Energy Corporation, Molitor Oil, Inc., Mull Drilling Company, Inc., Murfin Drilling Company, Inc., Musgrove Energy, Inc., Calvin Noah, Oil Company of America, Inc., Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd., Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc., Prolific Resources, LLC, Rama Operating Company, Inc., Randon Production Company, Inc., Red Oak Energy, Inc., Ritchie Exploration, Inc., Ross Hoener, Inc., Seeker, LLC, TGT Petroleum Corporation, Thoroughbred Associates, LLC, Three-D Resources, Inc., V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc., Veenker Resources, Inc., Vess Oil Corporation, Viking Resources, Inc., Vincent Oil Corporation, W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC, Wellstar Corporation, White Exploration, Inc., White Pine Petroleum Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Affidavit of P. Goodman, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Griffin, W.)
June 9, 2010 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Shell Trading (US) Company identifying Royal Dutch Shell PLC as corporate parent. (Badgerow, J.)
June 8, 2010 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by National Cooperative Refinery Association. (McElgunn, Christopher)
June 8, 2010 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Valero Marketing and Supply Company identifying Valero Energy Corporation as corporate parent. (King, Timothy)
June 8, 2010 Filing 29 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Timothy J. King on behalf of Valero Marketing and Supply Company. (King, Timothy)
June 4, 2010 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #27 MOTION to Transfer or Stay by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. (Attachments: #1 Group Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Group Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Martin, Coy)
June 4, 2010 Filing 27 MOTION to Transfer or Stay, and JOINDER by Defendant Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP. (Martin, Coy) (Motion title modified on 06/07/2010. (mg))
June 4, 2010 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case by Calcasieu Refining Company; Chevron Products Company, a division of Chevron U.S.A. Inc.; CIMA ENERGY, Ltd.; Cimmarron Gathering, LP; Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC; Delek Refining, Ltd.; Husky Marketing & Supply Company; Interstate Petroleum Corporation; Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc.; Shell Trading (US) Company; Enterprise Crude GP, LLC (formerly known as TEPPCO Crude GP, LLC); Valero Marketing and Supply Company; Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC and by Defendant National Cooperative Refinery Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 - Part 1, #3 Exhibit 2 - Part 2, #4 Exhibit 2 - Part 3, #5 Exhibit 3 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit 3 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit 3 - Part 3, #8 Exhibit 3 - Part 4, #9 Exhibit 3 - Part 5, #10 Exhibit 3 - Part 6, #11 Exhibit 3 - Part 7, #12 Exhibit 3 - Part 8, #13 Exhibit 3 - Part 9, #14 Exhibit 3 - Part 10)(McElgunn, Christopher)
June 4, 2010 Filing 25 Joint MOTION to Transfer Case or Stay Case by Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC; Calcasieu Refining Company; Chevron Products Company, a Division of Chevron U.S.A., Inc.; Cima Energy, Ltd.; Cimmarron Gathering, LP; Delek Refining Ltd.; Husky Marketing and Supply Company; Interstate Petroleum Corporation d/b/a High Sierra Crude Oil & Marketing, LLC; Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc.; Shell Trading (US) Company; Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP; Enterprise Crude GP, LLC (formerly known as Teppco Crude GP, LLC); Valero Marketing and Supply Company; Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC; and by Defendant National Cooperative Refinery Association. (McElgunn, Christopher) (Document title modified on 6/4/2010. (mg))
June 4, 2010 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Respond To Plaintiffs' Original Petition by Defendants Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., CIMA Energy Ltd., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Original Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Order dated 11/19/09)(McElgunn, Christopher) Modified on 6/4/2010 to correctly name filers. (alm)
June 3, 2010 MINUTE ENTRY: Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara added. Magistrate Judge Karen M. Humphreys no longer assigned to case. (This is a text entry only; there is no document associated with this transaction.)(sj)
June 3, 2010 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Douglas M. Crotty, III on behalf of Cimmarron Gathering, LP. (Crotty, Douglas)
June 3, 2010 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Calcasieu Refining Company identifying Transworld Oil U.S.A., Inc. as corporate parent. (Badgerow, J.)
June 2, 2010 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Teppco Crude GP, LLC identifying TCTM, L.P. as corporate parent. (Conrad, Lyndsey)
June 2, 2010 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cimmarron Gathering, LP. (Crotty, Douglas)
June 1, 2010 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Interstate Petroleum Corporation identifying High Sierra Energy, LP as corporate parent (Walker, James)
June 1, 2010 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CIMA Energy Ltd. identifying None as corporate parent. (Dersch, Veronica)
June 1, 2010 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC identifying Chesapeake Energy Corporation as corporate parent. (Ufford, Martin)
June 1, 2010 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Martin R. Ufford on behalf of Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC. (Ufford, Martin)
June 1, 2010 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Husky Marketing and Supply Company identifying Husky Refining Company as corporate parent. (Dersch, Veronica)
June 1, 2010 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Delek Refining Ltd. identifying Delek US Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent. (Dersch, Veronica)
June 1, 2010 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC identifying Coffeyville Resources, LLC as corporate parent and CVR Energy, Inc. as ultimate parent company. (Dersch, Veronica)
June 1, 2010 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Nick Badgerow on behalf of Shell Trading (US) Company. (Badgerow, J.)
June 1, 2010 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Nick Badgerow on behalf of Calcasieu Refining Company. (Badgerow, J.)
June 1, 2010 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc.. (Chalmers, Arthur)
May 28, 2010 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chevron USA, Inc. identifying Chevron USA Holdings, Inc. and Chevron Corporation as corporate parent. (Olmstead, Richard)
May 28, 2010 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Richard Allen Olmstead on behalf of Chevron USA, Inc. (Olmstead, Richard)
May 28, 2010 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP identifying Sunoco, Inc. as corporate parent. (Martin, Coy)
May 28, 2010 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Edmund S. Gross on behalf of Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC. (Gross, Edmund)
May 28, 2010 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Veronica L. Dersch on behalf of CIMA Energy Ltd., Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company. (Dersch, Veronica)
May 28, 2010 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Lee M. Smithyman on behalf of CIMA Energy Ltd., Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company. (Smithyman, Lee)
May 28, 2010 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $350.00, receipt number W4631003536. (adw)
May 28, 2010 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company - trial to be held in Kansas City. (adw)
May 28, 2010 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Cimmarron Transportation, LLC, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Crude Marketing & Transportation, Inc., Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC. (adw)
May 28, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pratt County District Court, Kansas, case number 2010cv34, filed by CIMA Energy Ltd., Calcasieu Refining Company, Chevron USA, Inc., Cimmarron Gathering, LP, Cimmarron Transportation, LLC, Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC, Crude Marketing & Transportation, Inc., Delek Refining Ltd., Husky Marketing and Supply Company, Interstate Petroleum Corporation, National Cooperative Refinery Association, Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc., Shell Trading (US) Company, Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP, Teppco Crude GP, LLC, Valero Marketing and Supply Company, Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(adw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anstine & Musgrove, Inc. et al v. Calcasieu Refining Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLM Exploration Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Plains Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oil Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Exploration Company
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coral Coast Petroleum, LC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pickrell Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Oil Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V.J.I. Natural Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Three-D Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Pine Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McGinness Oil Company of Kansas
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GRA EX, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randon Production Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ross Hoener, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thoroughbred Associates, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wellstar Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMX, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murfin Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mull Drilling Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prolific Resources, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dunne Equities, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hutchinson Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daystar Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H I, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LD Drilling, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herman L. Loeb, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TGT Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L & J Oil Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Double Eagle Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viking Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Noah
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drillers & Producers, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Exploration, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vess Oil Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W.D. Short Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ritchie Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & D Investments, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Red Oak Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mid-Continent Energy Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osborn Heirs Company, Ltd.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anstine & Musgrove, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seeker, LLC
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veenker Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McCoy Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Musgrove Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rama Operating Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.E. Exploration, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molitor Oil, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DK Operating, Inc.
Represented By: Kyle A. Lonergan
Represented By: Peter S. Goodman
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teppco Crude GP, LLC
Represented By: Martin M. Loring
Represented By: Lyndsey J. Conrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delek Refining Ltd.
Represented By: Robert S. Patterson, Sr.
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Veronica L. Dersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimmarron Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimmarron Gathering, LP
Represented By: Mark Banner
Represented By: Douglas M. Crotty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Timothy E. McKee
Represented By: James A. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crude Marketing & Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Energy Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Hite
Represented By: Arthur S. Chalmers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIMA Energy Ltd.
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Veronica L. Dersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunoco Logistics Partners, LP
Represented By: Courtney D. Tedrowe
Represented By: Christopher S. Moore
Represented By: Eric N. Macey
Represented By: Coy Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura Refining & Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Martin R. Ufford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husky Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Veronica L. Dersch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron USA, Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calcasieu Refining Company
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Cooperative Refinery Association
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Represented By: Michelle L. Brenwald-Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shell Trading (US) Company
Represented By: J. Nick Badgerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coffeyville Resources Refining & Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Lee M. Smithyman
Represented By: Veronica L. Dersch
Represented By: Edmund S. Gross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valero Marketing and Supply Company
Represented By: Timothy J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?