Berg v. Frobish et al
Plaintiff: |
Jerry L. Berg |
Defendant: |
Jon L. Frobish, Gary Fugit, Cross Real Estate Management, LLC, Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association and Simon Palmer Properties, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Jerry L. Berg |
Counter_claimant: |
Cedar Lakes Village Condominium Association, Gary Fugit, Simon Palmer Properties, Inc., Jon L. Frobish and Cross Real Estate Management, LLC |
Case Number: |
6:2012cv01123 |
Filed: |
April 5, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Kansas |
Office: |
Wichita Office |
County: |
Sedgwick |
Presiding Judge: |
Kenneth G. Gale |
Presiding Judge: |
Kathryn H. Vratil |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 2, 2014 |
Filing
389
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION regarding 383 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 384 Objection to Findings of Fact, Conclusionsof Law and Recommendations In Report and Recommendation on Defendants' Motion For Legal Fees is overruled. The 385 Objection of Defendants to Report and Recommendation of Magistrate on Defendants' Motion For Legal Fees is overruled. Further, the 383 Report and Recommendation on Defendants' MotionFor Legal Fees is adopted in its entirety. Defendants' 374 Motion for Legal Fees is overruled. Signed by District Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 10/02/2014. (mg)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing
372
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER sustaining Defendants' 351 Motion for Summary Judgment. Further, overruling as moot all other pending motions. The case is hereby remanded to the District Court of Sedgwick County, Kansas. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 12/12/2013. (mg)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
328
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: 203 Memorandum and Report and Recommendations are adopted in their entirety. Further, plaintiff's 115 Motion For Emergency Preliminary Injunction For Order To Compel Budget, Records And Access To Meetings Or For A Writ Of Mandamus is overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 7/3/2013. (mg)
|
June 4, 2013 |
Filing
319
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling plaintiff's 105 Motion To Dismiss Counterclaim For Breach Of Contract And Proposed Second Amended Cause For Breach Of Contract (Covenant Of Land Use Rights) For Failure To Plead A Justiciable Cause Of Action. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 6/4/2013. (mg)
|
May 9, 2013 |
Filing
247
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 238 Motion for Protective Order; granting 244 Motion to Supplement Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/9/2013. (df)
|
March 11, 2013 |
Filing
195
ORDER adopting in its entirety, Report and Recommendations regarding 109 Report and Recommendations. Further, defendants' 126 Objections to 109 Report and Recommendations are overruled. Signed by Chief Judge Kathryn H. Vratil on 3/11/2013. (mg)
|
November 20, 2012 |
Filing
114
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 80 Motion for a Mental Evaluation of the Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/20/2012. (df)
|
November 15, 2012 |
Filing
107
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 78 Motion to Amend Complaint.; denying 89 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/15/2012. (df)
|
July 31, 2012 |
Filing
38
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 25 Motion to Strike ; denying 10 Motion for Protective Order; denying 16 Motion to Strike ; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/31/2012. (df)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?