Kear v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tiffany Kear
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2012cv01235
Filed: June 29, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/29/14. (df)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying without prejudice 102 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 11/22/2013. (ms)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 133 Motion for Review. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/25/2013. (kao)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 117 Motion for Review. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 9/20/2013. (daw)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 104 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/15/2013. (df)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion to Compel; denying 110 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/12/2013. (df)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/18/2013. (df)
April 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 60 Motion for Review; and denying as moot 82 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply to and/or Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply Brief. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 4/30/2013. (bt)
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 28 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/20/2013. (df)
February 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 14 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Count 5 of the Complaint is dismissed without prejudice and Count 7 is dismissed with prejudice in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 2/4/2013. (pp)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 17 Motion for Reconsideration re 16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/6/2012. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kear v. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Kear
Represented By: Donald N. Peterson, II
Represented By: Sean M. McGivern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica L. Garner
Represented By: Alan L. Rupe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?