Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C. v. Girardi & Keese et al
Plaintiff: Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C.
Defendant: Thomas V. Girardi and Girardi & Keese
Case Number: 6:2013cv01115
Filed: March 22, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Richard D Rogers
Referring Judge: K Gary Sebelius
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2014 ***Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation of Dismissal.(aa)
August 4, 2014 Filing 26 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice) by Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C.. (Campbell, Ron)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Joint Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. By June 5, 2014, unless the parties have jointly filed a notice stating the full name, mailing address, and telephone number of the person whom they have selected to serve as mediator, along with the firmly scheduled date, time, and place of mediation, each party must submit a confidential settlement report by e-mail to the U.S. Magistrate Judge. Absent further order of the court, mediation shall occur no later than September 2, 2014. Mediation deadline 9/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 5/6/14. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
May 6, 2014 Filing 24 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order for Extension of Deadlines Pertaining to Alternative Dispute Resolution by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese(Henry, Brandon)
April 7, 2014 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff and Defendant's First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Girardi & Keese. (Henry, Brandon)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time is 4-5 days. Discovery deadline 11/3/2014. Dispositive motion deadline 12/3/2014. Mediation deadline 8/1/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/12/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2014 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Participants shall dial into the call at 785-338-5499. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/26/14. (bh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2014: #1 Corrected Main Document) (hs).
March 26, 2014 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/26/2014. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PROTECTIVE ORDER. The parties shall abide by the terms of the attached order. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 3/21/14. (bh)
March 20, 2014 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C. of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories to Defendant and Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant (Campbell, Ron)
January 22, 2014 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES. The parties shall note that this district has recently revised several of its procedures, standard forms, and orders, including the order setting the scheduling conference. As a part of these revisions, COPIES OF THE PARTIES' INITIAL DISCLOSURES ARE NOW DUE TO THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE AT THE TIME THE PLANNING REPORT IS SUBMITTED. Failure to comply with this deadline could result in the scheduling conference being rescheduled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (bh)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2014 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius. Participants shall call (785) 338-5499 at the scheduled time. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting deadline and deadline for submission of copies of initial disclosures to the magistrate judge 3/19/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Gary Sebelius on 1/22/2014. (bh)
January 21, 2014 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Girardi & Keese.(Cartmell, Thomas)
January 7, 2014 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Meyer, Ryan)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part #5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The court shall dismiss defendant Thomas V. Girardi for lack of personal jurisdiction. The remainder of the motion shall be denied. Signed by District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 1/6/2014. (meh)
May 31, 2013 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese re: #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cartmell, Thomas)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Reply brief will now be due on 5/31/2013. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 5/16/2013. (pp)
May 15, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese(Davis, Adam)
May 15, 2013 Filing 10 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Adam S. Davis on behalf of All Defendants (Davis, Adam)
May 3, 2013 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Meyer, Ryan)
April 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Response deadline 5/3/2013. Signed by District Judge Richard D. Rogers on 4/17/2013. (meh)
April 15, 2013 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #6 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Plaintiff Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C.(Meyer, Ryan)
March 29, 2013 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese(Cartmell, Thomas)
March 29, 2013 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese(Cartmell, Thomas)
March 26, 2013 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (alm)
March 26, 2013 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ryan K. Meyer on behalf of Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C.. (Meyer, Ryan)
March 22, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Thomas V. Girardi, Girardi & Keese. (smg)
March 22, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 12CV3020, filed by Girardi & Keese, Thomas V. Girardi.(smg)
March 22, 2013 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 350, receipt number W4631005459. (smg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C. v. Girardi & Keese et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas V. Girardi
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Adam S. Davis
Represented By: Brandon D. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Girardi & Keese
Represented By: Thomas P. Cartmell
Represented By: Adam S. Davis
Represented By: Brandon D. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hutton & Hutton Law Firm, L.L.C.
Represented By: Ron L. Campbell
Represented By: Ryan K. Meyer
Represented By: Lyndon W. Vix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?