D-J Engineering, Inc. v. 818 Aviation, Inc.
Plaintiff: D-J Engineering, Inc.
Defendant: 818 Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2014cv01033
Filed: January 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Butler
Presiding Judge: James P. O'Hara
Presiding Judge: Julie A. Robinson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 97 Motion to Modify. After a review of the factors, the court concludes that 818 has failed to show that a denial of its motion would result in manifest injustice. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 6/11/2018. (sz)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 92 Motion for Leave to File. Plaintiff may file a response on or before May 16, 2018. Defendant may file a reply on or before May 21, 2018. The reply brief is limited to 5 pages. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 5/2/2018. (sz)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The motion is granted as to D-J's claim for breach of contract; it is otherwise denied. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A Robinson on 8/1/17. (hw)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part and finding as moot in part Defendant's 10 Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Under Rule 12(b)(2), or, Alternatively, to Dismiss or Stay this Action in Deference to a Parallel, Pend ing California Suit. The motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction is denied; the motion to dismiss or stay in deference to a parallel California suit is moot. Further, finding as moot Defendant's original 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 08/20/2014. (mg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D-J Engineering, Inc. v. 818 Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D-J Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Terry L. Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 818 Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?