Mayfield et al v. Harvey County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Kent Mayfield and Tonya Mayfield
Defendant: Harvey County Sheriff's Department, Harvey County District Court, T. Walton, Carman Clark, Jim Bethards, Scott Motes, Todd Hanchett, Greg Nye, John Doe (1), John Doe (2), John Doe (3), Jane Doe (1), Jane Doe (2) and Jane Doe (3)
Case Number: 6:2014cv01307
Filed: September 12, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Harvey
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 115 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 115 Motion for Sanctions; granting 123 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 08/30/2017. Mailed to pro se party Kent Mayfield and Tonya Mayfield at 1020 S Hertzler Rd, Halstead, KS 67056 by regular mail. (aa)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 114 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/9/17. Mailed to pro se party Kent Mayfield, Tonya Mayfield by regular mail. (df)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 93 Motion to impose sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 2/8/17. Mailed to pro se party Kent Mayfield, Tonya Mayfield by regular mail. (df)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 01/13/2017. Mailed to pro se party Kent Mayfield and Tonya Mayfield at 1020 S Hertzler Rd, Halstead, KS 67056 by regular mail. (aa)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 37 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/26/15. Mailed to pro se parties Kent and Tonya Mayfield by regular mail. (mss)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 23 Harvey County District Court's Motion to Dismiss Party; and denying 30 plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/11/15. Mailed to pro se parties Kent and Tonya Mayfield by regular mail. (mss)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 10/6/14. Mailed to pro se Plaintiffs Kent & Tonya Mayfield by regular mail. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayfield et al v. Harvey County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Mayfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey County Sheriff's Department
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvey County District Court
Represented By: Stephen O. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Walton
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carman Clark
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Bethards
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Motes
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Hanchett
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Nye
Represented By: Toby Crouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (2)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe (3)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?