Vickers et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Gary Vickers and April Vickers
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC and Beneficial Financial I Inc.
Consolidated Defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2015cv01252
Filed: August 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Marten
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2016 ***Civil Case Terminated.(sz)
September 30, 2016 Filing 101 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by April Vickers, Gary Vickers. (Tibbets, Gaye)
August 30, 2016 Filing 100 ADR REPORT by Beneficial Financial I Inc.. ADR session held on: August 23, 2016 and conducted by Mr. Dennis Gillen. Results of ADR: Case settled at ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Guletz, Matthew)
August 22, 2016 Filing 99 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Beneficial Financial I Inc.. (Beatty, Mark)
August 17, 2016 Filing 98 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Beneficial's Objections and Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production, Beneficial's Objections and Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories, Beneficial's Privilege Log by Beneficial Financial I Inc.. (Beatty, Mark)
August 1, 2016 Filing 97 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure by April Vickers, Gary Vickers (Lomas, Rachel)
July 21, 2016 Filing 96 NOTICE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. of taking deposition of Hector Arambula on August 3, 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Beatty, Mark)
July 20, 2016 Filing 95 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. of taking deposition of Gary Vickers on August 3, 2016 (Beatty, Mark)
July 20, 2016 Filing 94 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. of taking deposition of April Vickers on August 2, 2016 (Beatty, Mark)
July 14, 2016 Filing 93 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. of taking deposition of April Vickers on 07/19/2016 (Beatty, Mark)
July 14, 2016 Filing 92 AMENDED NOTICE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. of taking deposition of Gary Vickers on 07/20/2016 (Beatty, Mark)
July 14, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE OF SERVICE by April Vickers, Gary Vickers of Discovery Requests (Lomas, Rachel)
July 13, 2016 Filing 90 WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by Michelle Witte and Katherine Malotte and ENTRY OF APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTED COUNSEL by Anna M. Berman on behalf of Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Berman, Anna)
July 5, 2016 Filing 89 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant American Security Insurance Company's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents Directed to Plaintiffs Gary and April Vickers by American Security Insurance Company. (Greenfield, Phillip)
July 5, 2016 Filing 88 Green Tree Servicing ANSWER to Complaint Third Amended Complaint by Green Tree Servicing, LLC.(Witte, Michelle)
July 1, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE OF SERVICE by April Vickers, Gary Vickers (Lomas, Rachel)
July 1, 2016 Filing 86 Beneficial Financial I Inc.'s ANSWER to #84 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Beneficial Financial I Inc..(Guletz, Matthew)
June 22, 2016 Filing 85 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by April Vickers, Gary Vickers (Lomas, Rachel)
June 21, 2016 Filing 84 AMENDED COMPLAINT Third against Beneficial Financial I Inc., Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed by April Vickers, Gary Vickers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Lomas, Rachel)
June 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting #82 motion for leave to file amended complaints in the consolidated cases. Defendants have informed the court that they do not oppose the motion. Plaintiffs are directed to file their amended complaint in each separate case forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/20/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ah)
June 16, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint, #36 Amended Complaint, #55 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lomas, Rachel)
May 20, 2016 Filing 81 NOTICE OF HEARING CHANGE: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Pursuant to this matter being reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara, the final pretrial conference set for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone will be held before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. The parties proposed pretrial order is due 10/14/2016. The court will initiate the conference call. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kg)
May 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/19/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj)
May 19, 2016 Filing 79 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Rachel E. Lomas, I on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lomas, Rachel)
May 19, 2016 Filing 78 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Gaye B. Tibbets on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tibbets, Gaye)
May 17, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Green Tree Servicing, LLC of First Request for Production and First Set of Interrogatorries (Witte, Michelle)
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation with Mr. Dennis L. Gillen on Tuesday, August 23, 2016, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 05/17/16. (Roach, Joyce)
May 13, 2016 Filing 75 Joint NOTICE of Scheduled Mediation by Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Guletz, Matthew)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. At the request of counsel, the mediation deadline is extended to 8/23/2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 5/13/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj)
April 28, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE OF SERVICE by April Vickers, Gary Vickers of Discovery (Carson, Elizabeth)
March 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/31/2016. (alm)
March 31, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE OF SERVICE by April Vickers, Gary Vickers of Initial Disclosure Documents (Carson, Elizabeth)
March 30, 2016 Filing 70 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant American Security Insurance Company's Initial Disclosure Documents by American Security Insurance Company. (Greenfield, Phillip)
March 30, 2016 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure Documents by Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Guletz, Matthew)
March 30, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Green Tree Servicing, LLC of Initial Disclosure Documents (Malotte, Katherine)
March 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 SCHEDULING ORDER: Mediation deadline 8/15/2016; discovery deadline 10/1/2016; dispositive motion deadline 11/7/2016; proposed Pretrial Orders due by 10/14/2016; final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2016 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer; In Limine Conference set for 4/26/2017 at 02:30 PM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JTM) before Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten; Case No. 15-1252 set prime for Jury Trial on 5/2/2017 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JTM) before Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten - estimated trial time 4 trial days; Case No. 15-1290 set first alternate for Jury Trial on 5/9/2017 at 09:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JTM) before Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten - estimated trial time 4 trial days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/23/16. (sj)
March 23, 2016 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 3/16/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj)
March 22, 2016 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of (i) First Interrogatories to Gary Vickers; (ii) First Interrogatories to April Vickers; (iii) First Requests for Admission to Gary Vickers; (iv) First Requests for Admission to April Vickers; and (v) First Set of Document Requests by Beneficial Financial I Inc.. (Guletz, Matthew)
March 10, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Green Tree Servicing, LLC of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Witte, Michelle)
March 9, 2016 Filing 64 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.'s Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Guletz, Matthew)
March 9, 2016 Filing 63 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant American Security Insurance Company's Initial Disclosures by American Security Insurance Company. (Greenfield, Phillip)
March 9, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE of Firm Name Change by American Security Insurance Company (Greenfield, Phillip)
March 3, 2016 Filing 61 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Beneficial Financial I Inc. identifying HSBC Finance Corporation, indirect subsidiary of HSBC Holdings plc as corporate parent (Guletz, Matthew)
February 18, 2016 Filing 60 Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.'s Answer and Affirmative Defenses ANSWER to #55 Amended Complaint by Beneficial Financial I Inc..(Guletz, Matthew)
February 18, 2016 Filing 59 Answer to Second Amended Complaint ANSWER to Complaint by Green Tree Servicing, LLC.(Malotte, Katherine)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. The scheduling conference initially set for February 16, 2016 is RESCHEDULED to March 16, 2016 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer via telephone conference call to be initiated by the court. Counsel shall confer and submit a Report of Parties Planning Meeting and copies of Rule 26 initial disclosures no later than March 9, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/18/16. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(sj)
February 18, 2016 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/16/2016. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj)
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION FOR DISCOVERY PURPOSES. This case shall be consolidated with Case No. 15-1290-JTM, Vickers, et al. v. American Security Insurance Company, for the purpose of discovery only. Case No. 15-1252-JTM shall be designated as the lead case. All future pretrial non-dispositive filings shall be made in the lead case bearing a consolidated case caption. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/17/16. (sj)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying #25 Motion to Dismiss; denying #26 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part #27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count I of plaintiffs' KCPA claim against Beneficial is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/12/2016. (sz)
February 4, 2016 Filing 55 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second against All Defendants, filed by April Vickers, Gary Vickers.(Carson, Elizabeth)
February 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #47 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file their Second Amended Complaint on or before February 15, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/1/16. (sj)
January 14, 2016 Filing 53 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Katherine E. Malotte on behalf of Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (Malotte, Katherine)
January 12, 2016 Filing 52 RESPONSE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. re #47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint (Guletz, Matthew)
January 12, 2016 Filing 51 RESPONSE by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC re #47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint (Hollander, Ross)
January 7, 2016 Filing 50 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC re: #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss (Witte, Michelle)
December 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER. Due to the filing of Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal #44 of the Second Amended Complaint #36 , the Court finds as moot Defendants' separate Motion to Strike the Second Amended Complaint #37 ; and Motion for Joinder #40 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/30/2015. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
December 29, 2015 Filing 48 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers(Carson, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #17 Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2015 Filing 46 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for a More Definite Statement Amended (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2015 Filing 45 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement Amended (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 29, 2015 Filing 44 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Second Amended Complaint by April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #36 Amended Complaint (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 23, 2015 Filing 43 REPLY to Response to Motion by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. re: #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Guletz, Matthew)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME granting #39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . Reply deadline 1/7/2016. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/22/2015. (aa)
December 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/16/2016 at 11:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Report of Parties Planning Meeting and copies of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 2/9/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/21/15. (sj)
December 21, 2015 Filing 40 MOTION for Joinder in Defendant Beneficial's Financial Inc.'s Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Witte, Michelle). Added MOTION to Strike on 12/22/2015 (sz).
December 21, 2015 Filing 39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (Witte, Michelle) Modified on 12/22/2015 to remove referral information. (mam)
December 21, 2015 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #39 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alm)
December 14, 2015 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #37 MOTION to Strike #36 Amended Complaint by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.(Guletz, Matthew)
December 14, 2015 Filing 37 MOTION to Strike #36 Amended Complaint by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Guletz, Matthew)
December 10, 2015 Filing 36 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second amended against Beneficial Financial I Inc., Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed by April Vickers, Gary Vickers.(Carson, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2015 Filing 35 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2015 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #25 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for a More Definite Statement (Carson, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Response deadline 12/10/2015. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/2/2015. (sz)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/2/15. (sj)
November 30, 2015 Filing 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions for Dismissal as to #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers. (Carson, Elizabeth) Modified on 12/1/2015 to remove referral information. (mam)
November 30, 2015 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #31 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motions for Dismissal as to #26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss , #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(alm)
November 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint #18 is GRANTED as unopposed. The permitted Amended Complaint has previously been filed [ECF No. 17]. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/12/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj)
November 9, 2015 Filing 29 RESPONSE by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. re #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (Joint Response filed on behalf of both Defendants) (Guletz, Matthew)
November 9, 2015 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Guletz, Matthew)
November 9, 2015 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Guletz, Matthew)
November 9, 2015 Filing 26 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Witte, Michelle)
November 9, 2015 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Witte, Michelle)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #21 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #11 MOTION to Dismiss, Reply deadline 11/9/15; #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, Reply deadline 11/9/15; and #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint, Response deadline 11/9/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/28/15. (sj)
October 26, 2015 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers(Carson, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2015 Filing 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Carson, Elizabeth)
October 26, 2015 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #18 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal , #17 Amended Complaint (on behalf of both Defendants) by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Guletz, Matthew)
October 14, 2015 Filing 20 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Carson, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2015 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Carson, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2015 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #1 Notice of Removal by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Carson, Elizabeth)
October 14, 2015 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beneficial Financial I Inc., Green Tree Servicing, LLC, filed by April Vickers, Gary Vickers.(Carson, Elizabeth)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response deadline 10/15/2015. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 9/24/2015. (sz)
September 24, 2015 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(sj)
September 23, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment, #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiffs April Vickers, Gary Vickers. (Carson, Elizabeth) Modified on 9/25/2015 to remove referral information. (mam)
September 7, 2015 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.(Guletz, Matthew)
September 7, 2015 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (Guletz, Matthew)
August 31, 2015 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark A Beatty on behalf of Beneficial Financial I Inc.. (Beatty, Mark)
August 27, 2015 Filing 11 MOTION AND MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( Response deadline 9/17/2015) by Defendant Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(sz)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for An Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Petition #9 is GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Petition on or before September 8, 2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/24/15. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (sj)
August 21, 2015 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Beneficial Financial I Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Guletz, Matthew)
August 21, 2015 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons on Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Served on 07/27/2015 by certified mail. Filed by Plaintiffs April Vickers & Gary Vickers. (THIS DOCUMENT WAS ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT) (aa)
August 21, 2015 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons on Beneficial Financial I Inc.. Served on 07/27/2015 by certified mail. Filed by Plaintiffs April Vickers & Gary Vickers. (THIS DOCUMENT WAS ORIGINALLY FILED IN THE SEDGWICK COUNTY DISTRICT COURT) (aa)
August 20, 2015 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing by Green Tree Servicing, LLC (Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 Filing 4 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 Filing 3 NOTICE of to Plaintiffs of Removal by Green Tree Servicing LLC (Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Green Tree Servicing LLC. (Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 15 CV 1852 ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number KSDC-3511214.), filed by Green Tree Servicing LLC.(Witte, Michelle)
August 20, 2015 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vickers et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Vickers
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Carson
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Represented By: Rachel E. Lomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Vickers
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Carson
Represented By: Rachel E. Lomas
Represented By: Gaye B. Tibbets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Michelle Moe Witte
Represented By: Katherine E.M. Chlumsky
Represented By: Ross A. Hollander
Represented By: Anna M. Berman
Represented By: Michael E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beneficial Financial I Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Hohn
Represented By: Matthew D. Guletz
Represented By: Mark A. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: American Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Matthew Flucke
Represented By: Phillip G. Greenfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?