Holick v. Burkhart
Plaintiff: Mark Holick
Defendant: Julie A. Burkhart
Case Number: 6:2016cv01188
Filed: June 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 405 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to retax costs (Doc. 401 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Costs in the amount of $4,662.14 are hereby taxed against Plaintiff and are included in the judgment. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/12/2020. (mam)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion for new trial (Doc. 390 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/12/2019. (mam)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 284 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment (Doc. 271 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/13/2019. (mam)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 270 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 249 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The motion is GRANTED as to the claim for abuse of process and DENIED as to the claim for malicious prosecution. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 5/15/2019. (mam)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 251 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 248 Motion for De Minimis Extension of Time. The motion is DENIED with respect to extension of time to file a dispositive motion. The motion is GRANTED with respect to filing of a Daubert motion. Plaintiff is granted until December 20, 2018, to file a Daubert motion. the Pretrial Order is modified to reflect that trial of this action on September 17, 2019, shall be to a jury. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/18/2018. (mam)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 203 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge; denying 215 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge; granting 226 Motion to Disregard Reply Brief; denying 227 Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief; granting 234 Motion to Maintain Seal to the extent stated in the order. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 08/24/2018. (aa)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 155 (Motion) Objection to Confidentiality Designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/14/18. (df)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 199 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The denial is without prejudice to Plaintiff refiling a motion that contains an adequate showing for sealing the exhibits. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 05/08/2018. (aa)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 152 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/30/18. (df)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 149 Motion to Quash; granting 151 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal; finding as moot 177 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/18/18. (df)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 146 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 115 Motion to Compel; granting in part 118 Motion to Compel; denying 118 Request for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/11/18. (df)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 11/30/17. (df)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 57 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Protective Order; finding as moot 71 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/29/17. (df)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/9/17. (df)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Unseal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/8/17. (df)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 36 Sealed Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 8/4/17. (df)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 1/6/2017. (sz)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holick v. Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Holick
Represented By: Martin A. Cannon
Represented By: Donald A. McKinney, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Burkhart
Represented By: Robert Vinson Eye
Represented By: Erin C. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?