Raymond et al v. Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donetta Raymond, Frederick Heston, Jilun Sha, Randy Williams, William Scott Denny, Debra Hatcher, Brian Marks, Russell Ballard, Gregory Bucchin, Bruce Ensor, Forrest Faris, Cheryl Renee Gardner, Clark T. Harbaugh, Craig Hoobler, Brian Scott Jackson, William Koch, Fred Longan, David B. Miller, Kenneth L Poole, Jr., Bahram Rahbar, Russell Sprague, Craig Tolson, Robert Troilo, Curtis J. Vines, Bradley Kent Asmann, Richard T. Bach, Robin S. Bradley, Kathleen K. Byram, Emilio C. Caire, Jr., John M. Chandler, Tiffiney Dawn Conley, Victor L. Daniels, Deadra E. Doyon, Roderick L. Duke, Anne M. Duncan, Jimmie L. Felt, Steven Eric Floyd, Ronald E. Guest, Joel M. Goyot, Audrey Henning, Alan B. Holt, Randy T. Hopper, Donna J. Hottman, James Hutchison, Korvin J. Kilgroe, Lambert Kobagaya, Nick Koss, Dennis Kraus, Daniel L. Krenke, John O. Lawellin, Robert H. Lawson, Brent John Lobile, Jill Lorber, Jeff Martin, Brian T. Maschino, William B. Moehring, Brian Owens, Jodene Patterson, Cornell D. Payne, Pon Phouthavong, Nancy D. Rapp, James D. Reese, Dennis Edward Richardson, Jeffrey Lee Roberts, James R. Russell, Terry Sawyer, Ronald Schauf, Shane Schmidt, Chadwick R. Scott, Michael Duane Shaheen, Terry Spear, Diane G. Ward, Larry G. Weaver and Glen Fondaw
Defendant: Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. and Spirit Aerosystems, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2016cv01282
Filed: July 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:451
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 553 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 524 Motion to Dismiss. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/11/2020. (sz)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 455 Motion to Amend Complaint.; denying as moot 466 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs may file their amended complaint within ten days of this order. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 1/3/2020. (sz)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 454 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Defendants' motion for partial judgment on the pleadings (Doc. 409 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs' fifth claim for relief, alleging a disparate impact claim under 29 U.S.C. § 623(a)(2) based on Spirit's failure to hire Plaintiffs, is DISMISSED. Plaintiffs' motion for hearing (Doc. 424 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 8/14/2019. (mam)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 411 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 387 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Order for Interlocutory Appeal; granting 394 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File a Reply. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 4/30/2019. (mam)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 385 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 338 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 342 Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 12/14/2018. (sz)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 369 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER taking under advisement 365 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal ; taking under advisement 367 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The court will likewise hold the motion in abeyance for 7 days to give Defendants an opportunity to explain the justification for sealing them and, absent such a showing, will order that they be filed without seal. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 5/9/2018. (sz)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 318 Non-party SPEEA's Motion to Quash Defendants' Second Subpoena. See Memorandum and Order for details Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/21/17. (sj)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 287 AMENDED (JOINT) PHASE I PROTECTIVE ORDER. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/7/17.(adc)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 255 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 235 Objection to Order of Magistrate Judge; denying 252 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 9/6/2017. (sz)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 172 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order and Sanctions. Defendants must submit an itemized fee request by July 31, 2017. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/30/17. (sj)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 202 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 193 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/22/17. (sj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond et al v. Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donetta Raymond
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Heston
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jilun Sha
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Williams
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Scott Denny
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Hatcher
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Marks
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Ballard
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bucchin
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Ensor
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Faris
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Renee Gardner
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark T. Harbaugh
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Hoobler
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Scott Jackson
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Koch
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Longan
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David B. Miller
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L Poole, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bahram Rahbar
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Sprague
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Tolson
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Troilo
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis J. Vines
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Kent Asmann
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard T. Bach
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin S. Bradley
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen K. Byram
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio C. Caire, Jr.
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Chandler
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffiney Dawn Conley
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor L. Daniels
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deadra E. Doyon
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick L. Duke
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne M. Duncan
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie L. Felt
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Eric Floyd
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald E. Guest
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel M. Goyot
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Henning
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan B. Holt
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy T. Hopper
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna J. Hottman
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hutchison
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Korvin J. Kilgroe
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lambert Kobagaya
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nick Koss
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Kraus
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L. Krenke
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John O. Lawellin
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert H. Lawson
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent John Lobile
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Lorber
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Martin
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian T. Maschino
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Moehring
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Owens
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodene Patterson
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornell D. Payne
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pon Phouthavong
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy D. Rapp
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Reese
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Edward Richardson
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Lee Roberts
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R. Russell
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Sawyer
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Schauf
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Schmidt
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chadwick R. Scott
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Duane Shaheen
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Spear
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane G. Ward
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Weaver
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glen Fondaw
Represented By: Kimberly J. Jones
Represented By: Diane S. King
Represented By: Daniel B. Kohrman
Represented By: Laurie A. McCann
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Dara S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit AeroSystems Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Armstrong
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Represented By: Charles E. McClellan
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Represented By: Trisha A. Thelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirit Aerosystems, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Armstrong
Represented By: Boyd A. Byers
Represented By: Charles E. McClellan
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Represented By: Trisha A. Thelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?