Coleman v. Apple Eight Overland Park, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Ann Coleman
Defendant: Apple Eight Overland Park, LLC, Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc., Apple Eight Services Overland Park, Inc., Apple Eight Hospitality Midwest, LLC, Marriott International, Inc. and Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2016cv01343
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Teresa J. James
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 71 Motion for Review. The Magistrate Judge's Order 59 permitting the filing of an amendment complaint and allowing substitution of parties is AFFIRMED. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 5/8/2017. (sz)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part 30 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response deadline 3/22/2017. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 3/13/2017. (sz)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 41 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Reply in Support of her Motion to Amend Pleadings, or in the Alternative, for Leave to File Surreply. It is further ordered that Defendants' request for oral argument on [2 7] Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, Motion to Substitute Party is granted. A limited evidentiary hearing will be set by further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 2/10/2017. (byk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Apple Eight Overland Park, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Coleman
Represented By: Todd M. Johnson
Represented By: Brett T. Votava
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Overland Park, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Management, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Services Overland Park, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Eight Hospitality Midwest, LLC
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott Hotel Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brian M. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher C. Confer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?