Anderson v. Bush et al
Plaintiff: Dewayne Antoine Anderson
Defendant: Thomas Bush, Naomi Arnold, Trindad Balderas and (fnu) Ramsey
Case Number: 6:2016cv01376
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 40 DEFENDANTS NAOMI ARNOLD'S AND TRINIDAD BALDERAS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 8/18/2017. Mailed to pro se party Dewayne Antoine Anderson by regular mail. (mam)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 19 Defendant Thomas Bush's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Thomas Marten on 4/10/2017. Mailed to pro se party Dewayne Antoine Anderson by regular mail. (mam)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 12 Defendants' Motion for More Definite Statement. Amended Complaint due by 3/24/2017. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 2/23/17. Mailed to pro se party Dewayne Antoine Anderson by regular mail. (sj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dewayne Antoine Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Bush
Represented By: Michael J. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Arnold
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trindad Balderas
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Ramsey
Represented By: Erik Houghton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?