Marshall et al v. Burnley et al
Plaintiff: Krystal M. Marshall and Milton J. Davison
Defendant: Benjamin Burnley, Jason Rauch, Keith Wallen, Shaun Foist, Aaron Bruch, Hollywood Records, Inc., Catherine Leslie, Cotillion Ballroom, Molly Doe, Troy Doe, Mike Doe, Matt Doe, John/Jane Doe (5), John/Jane Doe (6), John/Jane Doe (7), New England Audio LLC, John/Jane Doe (8), John/Jane Doe (9), Lauree (lnu), Dueling Piano Bar, Gabriel Doe, John/Jane Doe (10), John/Jane Doe (11), Wichita City Council, Bob Adams, (fnu) Holland and Correctional Care Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2017cv01090
Filed: April 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER regarding 95 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Bob Adams. The court dismisses plaintiff's claims against Adams for lack of prosecution. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 06/13/2018. (aa)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The clerk is directed to enter judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) reflecting that all of the claims asserted by plaintiff Krystal M. Marshall are hereby dismissed, and Ms. Marshall is hereby terminated as a party to the action. Th e claims asserted by Ms. Marshall are based on an incident separate from the incident alleged by plaintiff Milton Davison, and entry of judgment on Marshall's claims will have no effect on Mr. Davison's remaining claims. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 04/05/2018. Mailed to pro se parties Krystal M. Marshall & Milton J. Davison at 935 N Beech St, Wichita, KS 67206 by regular mail. (aa)
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 71 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; granting 79 New England Audio, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims against this defendant are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 2/20/2018. Mailed to pro se party Milton J. Davison & Krystal M. Marshall at 935 N Beech St. Wichita, KS 67206 by regular mail. (mam)
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by the Breaking Benjamin defendants (Aaron Bruch, Benjamin Burnley, Shaun Foist, Jason Rauch, and Keith Wallen). The claims against these defendants are dismissed with prejudice; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Hollywood Records, Inc.. The claims against this defendant are dismissed with prejudice; granting 52 Motion for More Definite Statement by Defendant Bob Adams; granting 53 Motion to Dism iss by Defendant Wichita City Council. The claims against this defendant are dismissed without prejudice.; granting 55 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Catherine Leslie and Cotillion Ballroom. The claims against these defendants are dismissed witho ut prejudice.; denying 57 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Dueling Piano Bar; denying 58 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; denying 61 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 62 Motion for Discovery; denying 62 Motion for Leave to File Conventiona lly; denying 63 Motion to Add Parties. Any amended complaint by plaintiffs correcting the foregoing deficiencies shall be filed by December 28, 2017. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 12/14/2017. Mailed to pro se party Krystal M. Marshall & Milton J. Davison at 935 N Beech St, Wichita, KS 67206 by regular mail (aa)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Plaintiffs' Notice of Appeal (Dkt. 12) is considered as an objection to the Magistrate Judge's order of June 8, 2017, and is hereby DENIED. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 07/17/2017. Mailed to pro se party Krystal M. Marshall and Milton J. Davison at 935 N Beech St, Wichita, KS 67206 by regular mail. (aa)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 6 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiffs' Complaint against defendants Correctional Care Solutions, Brian D. Caplan, and "Kansas Association Employees Lauree" is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by District Judge J. Thomas Marten on 06/28/2017. (aa)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This Document also serves as the Report & Recommendation to the District Court of Dismissal of certain of Plaintiffs' claims and of certain Defendants. The document is included in the Court's docketing system as 2 separate documents for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/23/17. Mailed to pro se party Krystal Marshall, Milton Davison by regular mail. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall et al v. Burnley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal M. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Milton J. Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Burnley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Wallen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaun Foist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Bruch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollywood Records, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cotillion Ballroom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molly Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (5)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (6)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (7)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New England Audio LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (8)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (9)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauree (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dueling Piano Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Doe (11)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita City Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Holland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Care Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?