Donaldson vs. United States Department of Treasury, et al.

Plaintiff: Joseph V. Donaldson
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and Mark Boston
Case Number: 6:2017cv01213
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: Kansas District Court
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Referring Judge: Gwynne E. Birzer
Presiding Judge: Eric F. Melgren
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 29 Motion for Equitable Estoppel; denying as moot 38 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 14 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying as moot 14 Motion for Hearing; granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 4/11/2018.Mailed to pro se party Joseph V. Donaldson by regular mail. (sz)
March 1, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DENYING 28 Motion for Mandatory Judicial Notice. Further, the request contained in Plaintiff's Reply (ECF No. 35 ) for additional judicial notice, to the extent it may be construed as an additional motion, is DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 3/1/18. Mailed to pro se party Joseph V. Donaldson at 209 E. William Street, Suite 506, Wichita, KS 67202 by regular mail. (alm)
October 23, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion to Compel. See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/23/17. Mailed to pro se party Joseph V. Donaldson by regular mail. (adc)
September 18, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 4 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the clerk of court shall take the appropriate steps to serve defendants with the summons and complaint; and granting in part and denying in part 5 Pla intiff's Motion for Mandatory Judicial Notice and Request to File Under Seal. The clerk shall grant access to sealed document(s) to counsel of record. Pro hac vice attorneys must obtain sealed document(s) from local counsel. See Memorandum and Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 9/18/17. Mailed to pro se party Joseph V. Donaldson by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 1640 0000 9096 6319. (sj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donaldson vs. United States Department of Treasury, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph V. Donaldson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Treasury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?