Jayhawk 910VP, LLC v. WindAirWest, LLC
Plaintiff: Jayhawk 910VP, LLC
Defendant: WindAirWest, LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv01153
Filed: May 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: John W. Broomes
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G. Gale
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/14/21. (df)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 59 Motion to Alter 54 Judgment and granting 59 Motion to Amend 29 Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/17/2020. (df)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/7/2020. (df)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jayhawk 910VP, LLC v. WindAirWest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayhawk 910VP, LLC
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Represented By: Christopher A. McElgunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WindAirWest, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?