Larson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Desiree A. Larson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 6:2018cv01228
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. Upon review of the ADR report, the Court notes this case has been resolved. Counsel shall file a motion to dismiss and submit a proposed order for approval by Judge Melgren, or file a stipulation of dismissal no later than November 5, 2018. The scheduling conference set for 10/29/2018 and all related deadlines are cancelled. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/4/18. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
October 2, 2018 Filing 11 ADR REPORT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. ADR session held on: N/A and conducted by N/A. Results of ADR: Case settled before ADR. Status of litigation at time of ADR: Partial Discovery(Calhoun, Penny)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/29/2018 at 11:00 AM in Wichita Courtroom 326 before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/28/18. (alm)
August 28, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Aaron J. Good on behalf of Desiree A. Larson. (Good, Aaron)
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Calhoun, Penny)
August 20, 2018 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE: Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 7/20/2018 (originally filed in the Sedgwick County Kansas District Court on 7/23/2018). (mam)
August 20, 2018 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORDS from Sedgwick County District Court. (Sanders, James)
August 16, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Penny A. Calhoun on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Calhoun, Penny)
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company identifying None as corporate parent (Sanders, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (Sanders, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Sanders, James)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sedgwick County District Court, case number 2018-CV-001528-TC Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4558273.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Records State Court Pleadings)(Sanders, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: James L. Sanders
Represented By: Penny A. Calhoun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree A. Larson
Represented By: Phillip Bradley Slape
Represented By: Aaron J. Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?