Superior Tool Service, Inc. v. Puentes et al
Plaintiff: Superior Tool Service, Inc.
Defendant: Phillip Weitzel, Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Isidro Puentes and Blackhawk Industrial Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01229
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Sedgwick
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Phillip Weitzel of Defendants Phillip Weitzel's and Industrial Distribution Services, LLC's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Casey, Derek)
October 10, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Superior Tool Service, Inc. of Rule 26 Disclosures (Griffin, William)
October 5, 2018 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint by Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Phillip Weitzel.(Casey, Derek)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting, for good cause shown, defense counsel's informal request for extension of time until October 5, 2018, for the parties to confer as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/4/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(srj)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 5, 2018, for defendants Phillip Weitzel and Industrial Distribution Services, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/24/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (srj)
September 21, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Phillip Weitzel (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Casey, Derek)
September 13, 2018 Filing 20 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held August 17, 2018 before Judge Eric F. Melgren, Court Reporter Jana McKinney, 316-315-4268, jana_mckinney@ksd.uscourts.gov. Transcript purchased by: Mr. Derek Casey. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 7 calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ksd.uscourts.gov. Please read this policy carefully. If no Notice of Intent to Redact is filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available on the date set forth below. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2018. (jlm)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 09:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 10/10/2018. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 10/10/2018. All participants must call the conference line at 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 8914911 for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/10/18. (ss)
September 6, 2018 Filing 18 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 09/21/2018 for Defendants Phillip Weitzel & Industrial Distribution Services, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/06/2018. (aa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Superior Tool Service, Inc. Without Prejudice as to Defendant Blackhawk Industrial Distribution, Inc. (Griffin, William)
August 28, 2018 Filing 16 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Eric B. Metz on behalf of Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Phillip Weitzel. (Metz, Eric)
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Derek S. Casey on behalf of Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Phillip Weitzel. (Casey, Derek)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for TRO/Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 8/17/2018. Mailed to pro se party Isidro Puentes; Phil Weitzel, Industrial Distribution Services by regular mail as all parties were present for the hearing. Mailing addresses were provided by plaintiff's counsel. (cm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Superior Tool Service, Inc. upon Isidro Puentes served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018 (Lindskog, Ashlyn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Superior Tool Service, Inc. upon Phillip Weitzel served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018 (Lindskog, Ashlyn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal by Superior Tool Service, Inc. upon Industrial Distribution Services, LLC served on 8/17/2018, answer due 9/7/2018 (Lindskog, Ashlyn)
August 17, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge Eric F. Melgren: MOTION HEARING held on 8/17/2018 re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Superior Tool Service, Inc.. (Court Reporter Jana McKinney.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cm)
August 17, 2018 Filing 9 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jerrick L. Irby on behalf of Blackhawk Industrial Distribution, Inc.. (Irby, Jerrick)
August 17, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Blackhawk Industrial Distribution, Inc., Industrial Distribution Services, LLC, Isidro Puentes & Phillip Weitzel. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
August 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2018 at 01:00 PM in Wichita Courtroom 408 (EFM) before District Judge Eric F. Melgren. (cm)
August 17, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
August 16, 2018 Filing 7 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Superior Tool Service, Inc. - trial to be held in Wichita. (Griffin, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Superior Tool Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Griffin, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Ashlyn B. Lindskog on behalf of Superior Tool Service, Inc.. (Griffin, William) Modified on 8/17/2018 to correct what attorney the entry of appearance is for (aa).
August 16, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Superior Tool Service, Inc. . (Griffin, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Superior Tool Service, Inc.. (Griffin, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Superior Tool Service, Inc.. (Griffin, William)
August 16, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4559255), filed by Superior Tool Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit - Redacted B, #3 Exhibit C)(Griffin, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Superior Tool Service, Inc. v. Puentes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Weitzel
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Represented By: Eric B. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Distribution Services, LLC
Represented By: Derek S. Casey
Represented By: Eric B. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Puentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackhawk Industrial Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Jerrick L. Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Superior Tool Service, Inc.
Represented By: William Rick Griffin
Represented By: Ashlyn Brianne Lindskog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?