Ratcliff v. Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Christopher George Ratcliff
Defendant: USD 305 and Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2018cv01240
Filed: August 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to #30 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(jmr)
October 23, 2018 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by USD 305.(Peterson, Jacob)
October 23, 2018 Filing 30 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (mam) Modified on 10/24/2018 to remove referral information. (mam)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #25 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Please see order for details. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 10/10/2018. (aa)
October 9, 2018 Filing 28 RESPONSE by Defendant Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Fowler, Kevin)
October 8, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SUPPORTING MEMORANDUM by Defendant Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. (Fowler, Kevin)
October 5, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE by Defendant USD 305 re #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Peterson, Jacob)
October 4, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET TEXT MODIFICATION by Deputy Clerk regarding #25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The text of docket entry #25 has been modified. The Plaintiff indicates that it is not a Response to the Motion to Dismiss, but a Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (aa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION. (aa) Modified on 10/4/2018 to correct the event type (aa).
September 28, 2018 Filing 24 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/23/2018 for Defendant USD 305 to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/28/2018. (aa)
September 21, 2018 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Broomes: MOTION HEARING held on 9/21/2018 re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Christopher George Ratcliff and #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Christopher George Ratcliff. Court also notes the filing of #17 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by USD 305. Court informed Plaintiff that he could not represent his minor son K.R., and advised him to make efforts to obtain counsel to represent K.R. Plaintiff given 21 days (which is the response deadline to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss) to obtain counsel or otherwise file a response. (Court Reporter Jana McKinney.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Amended Certificate of Service by Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. re #19 Response to Motion (Fowler, Kevin)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 RESPONSE by Defendant Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. re #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Fowler, Kevin)
September 20, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Cerified mail by Christopher George Ratcliff upon Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- certified mail by Christopher George Ratcliff upon USD 305 served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant USD 305(Hiatt, Jared)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION by Defendant USD 305 (Hiatt, Jared)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING #13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2018 at 09:30 AM in Wichita Courtroom 238 (JWB) before District Judge John W. Broomes. (jmr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jared T. Hiatt on behalf of USD 305. (Hiatt, Jared)
September 17, 2018 Filing 14 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jacob E. Peterson on behalf of USD 305. (Peterson, Jacob)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Kevin M. Fowler on behalf of Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc.. (Fowler, Kevin)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Randall J. Forbes on behalf of Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc.. (Forbes, Randall)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for TRO. Application fails to meet the requirements set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(1)(A). Entered by District Judge John W. Broomes on 09/07/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
September 6, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. & USD 305. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Because Plaintiff proceeds in forma pauperis, the clerk of the court shall take the appropriate steps to serve Defendants with the summons and Complaint as provided under 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 09/06/2018. (aa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 7 PAGE 3 to #6 Supplement by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
August 28, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification in this case. (mg)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 (NOTE: Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (aa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (aa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Injunction by Plaintiff Christopher George Ratcliff. (THIS IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY #1 . DOCUMENT REFILED TO ACCOUNT FOR THE MOTION PORTION.) (aa)
August 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Wichita, filed by Christopher George Ratcliff.(aa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ratcliff v. Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USD 305
Represented By: Jacob E. Peterson
Represented By: Jared T. Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas State High School Activities Association, Inc.
Represented By: Randall J. Forbes
Represented By: Kevin M. Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher George Ratcliff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?