Wilson v. Nguyen

Plaintiff: Sarah Wilson
Defendant: Mong Lan Nguyen
Case Number: 6:2018cv01247
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
0 Judge: Eric F Melgren
1 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(amh)
October 12, 2018 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Mong Lan Nguyen (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tone Nguyen)(Bell, Shannon)
October 12, 2018 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (Response deadline 11/2/2018), MOTION for More Definite Statement (Response deadline 10/26/2018) by Defendant Mong Lan Nguyen. (Bell, Shannon) Modified on 10/16/2018 to remove referral information. (mam)
September 27, 2018 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/12/2018 for Defendant Mong Lan Nguyen to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/27/2018. (aa)
September 11, 2018 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Sarah Wilson upon Mong Lan Nguyen served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018 (Monismith, Pete)
August 30, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mong Lan Nguyen. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (aa)
August 30, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
August 30, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Sarah Wilson. (Monismith, Pete)
August 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4570968.), filed by Sarah Wilson.(Monismith, Pete)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mong Lan Nguyen
Represented By: Shannon L. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Wilson
Represented By: Pete M. Monismith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?