Williams v. Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda J. Williams and Linda Williams
Defendant: Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. and Lori Cromwell
Case Number: 6:2018cv01252
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 11/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 10/25/2018. (mn)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. identifying Viavi Solutions, Inc. as corporate parent (Shulda, Teresa)
October 23, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Aeroflex Wichita, Inc., Lori Cromwell.(Shulda, Teresa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/23/2018 for Defendant Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. and 10/24/2018 for Defendant Lori Cromwell to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/27/2018. (mam)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Teresa L. Shulda on behalf of Aeroflex Wichita, Inc., Lori Cromwell (Shulda, Teresa)
September 24, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Linda Williams upon Lori Cromwell served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018 (Hill, Jennifer)
September 24, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Linda Williams upon Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018 (Hill, Jennifer)
September 10, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Aeroflex Wichita, Inc., Lori Cromwell (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
September 10, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
September 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Linda Williams. (Hill, Jennifer)
September 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita (Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4577737), filed by Linda Williams. (Hill, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Aeroflex Wichita, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Williams
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Williams
Represented By: Jennifer M. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aeroflex Wichita, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Cromwell
Represented By: Teresa L. Shulda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?