Stearns v. Haring et al
Plaintiff: Shawna L. Stearns
Defendant: Gloria Haring and Steve Haring
Case Number: 6:2018cv01258
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
2 Judge: Eric F Melgren
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Shawna L. Stearns of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26 (Ayesh, Mark)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 1/7/2019 at 01:30 PM in Room 322 before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 12/31/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 10/25/18. (alm)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint by Gloria Haring, Steve Haring.(Dalke, Krystle)
September 28, 2018 Filing 8 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/29/2018 for Defendants Gloria Haring & Steve Haring to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 09/28/2018. (aa)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren for all further proceedings. District Judge John W. Broomes no longer assigned to case Entered by deputy clerk on 09/28/2018. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(jmr)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Matthew K. Holcomb on behalf of Gloria Haring, Steve Haring. (Holcomb, Matthew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Krystle M. S. Dalke on behalf of Gloria Haring, Steve Haring. (Dalke, Krystle)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Shawna L. Stearns upon Gloria Haring served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018 (Ayesh, Mark)
September 26, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Shawna L. Stearns upon Steve Haring served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018 (Ayesh, Mark)
September 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gloria Haring, Steve Haring (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mam)
September 12, 2018 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Shawna L. Stearns. (Ayesh, Mark)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4580821.), filed by Shawna L. Stearns.(Ayesh, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stearns v. Haring et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawna L. Stearns
Represented By: David Michael Hahn
Represented By: Mark G. Ayesh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Haring
Represented By: Matthew K. Holcomb
Represented By: Krystle M. S. Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Haring
Represented By: Matthew K. Holcomb
Represented By: Krystle M. S. Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?