Educational Credit Management Corporation v. Metz

Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court-Wichita Division
Trustee: Carl B. Davis
Appellant: Educational Credit Management Corporation and Vicky Jo Metz
Case Number: 6:2018cv01281
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: Kansas District Court
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 7 LETTER TO COUNSEL -- RECORD ON APPEAL received from the US Bankruptcy Court. (mam)
November 19, 2018 6 CONVENTIONALLY FILED EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #5 Bankruptcy Record on Appeal. Three (3) exhibit notebooks received from the trial held 8/14/2018 before Hon. Robert E. Nugent. Items will be stored in the Wichita clerk's office. (mam)
November 17, 2018 5 BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL received re Bankruptcy Court case Number 12-13120 (Adversary case number 17-5119). (Attachments: #1 Appellee/Cross-Appellant Vicky Jo Metz's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #2 Appellant/Cross-Appellee Educational Credit Management Corporation's Designation of Record and Issues on Appeal, #3 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet plus DEs 1, 8, 11-12, 47-53, 57 & 61, #4 Transcript of the trial held 8/14/2018 - restricted through 2/14/2019) (mam)
October 12, 2018 4 NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 12-13120. Adversary case number 17-5119. File received, filed by Vicky Jo Metz. (Attachments: #1 Docket sheet)(aa)
October 12, 2018 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Martin J. Peck on behalf of Vicky Jo Metz (Peck, Martin)
October 11, 2018 2 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Karin N. Amyx on behalf of Carl B. Davis (Amyx, Karin)
October 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 12-13120. Adversary case number 17-5119. Filed by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Decision and Order, #2 Judgment, #3 Judgment)(aa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Educational Credit Management Corporation v. Metz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court-Wichita Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Carl B. Davis
Represented By: Karin N. Amyx
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: N. Larry Bork, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Vicky Jo Metz
Represented By: Martin J. Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?